EP3556818 - PRINTING INK COMPOSITION FOR SOFT PACKAGING LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sakata INX Corporation 23-37 Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0002 / JP | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARADA, Junichi c/o SAKATA INX CORPORATION 23-37 Edobori 1-Chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0002 / JP | 02 /
OGAWA, Toru c/o SAKATA INX CORPORATION 23-37 Edobori 1-Chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0002 / JP | 03 /
MAEOKA, Yoshiaki c/o SAKATA INX CORPORATION 23-37 Edobori 1-Chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0002 / JP | 04 /
TAKABAYASHI, Ryo c/o SAKATA INX CORPORATION 23-37 Edobori 1-Chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0002 / JP | 05 /
AKASAKA, Kenta c/o SAKATA INX CORPORATION 23-37 Edobori 1-Chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0002 / JP | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/43] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 17879885.6 | 14.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017JP44967 | Priority number, date | JP20160243677 | 15.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016243677 | JP20170146813 | 28.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017146813 | JP20170228805 | 29.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017228805 | [2019/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018110664 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556818 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/10, B41J2/01 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
B32B23/08 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/16 (EP);
B32B27/306 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
B41J2/01 (EP);
C08G18/4238 (EP);
C08G18/4283 (EP);
C08G18/4286 (EP);
C08G18/722 (EP);
C08G18/755 (EP);
C08G18/758 (EP);
C09D11/037 (EP);
C09D11/102 (EP);
C09D175/06 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2255/28 (EP);
B32B2307/4023 (EP);
B32B2307/518 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/746 (EP);
B32B2307/75 (EP);
B32B2439/46 (EP);
B32B2439/70 (EP);
B32B2553/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3228 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/3234 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/3271 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | DRUCKTINTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR WEICHES VERPACKUNGSLAMINAT | [2019/43] | English: | PRINTING INK COMPOSITION FOR SOFT PACKAGING LAMINATE | [2019/43] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ENCRE D'IMPRESSION POUR STRATIFIÉ D'EMBALLAGE SOUPLE | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2019 | Translation filed | 06.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 10.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0264174 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [X] 1,4,9 * examples *; | [X]JPH09255909 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [X] 1,4,9 * paragraphs [0022] - [0028]; examples 1-4 *; | [X]JP2001115076 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [X] 1,4,9 * paragraphs [0049] - [0054] *; | [X]JP2002069353 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [X] 4,9* paragraphs [0033] , [0034]; example 1 *; | [X]JP2009155584 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [X] 4,9 * paragraph [0046]; example 1 *; | [X]CN101525405 (BEIJING COMENS CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,4,9 * example 3; claim 1 *; | [X]JP2011122064 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [X] 4,8,9 * example 5 *; | [X]JP2011252122 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [X] 1,4,9 * paragraphs [0061] , [0062]; tables 1,2 *; | [X]CN102432993 (SHANXI INST OF APPLIED CHEMISTRY) [X] 4,9 * claim 1 *; | [X]CN102796242 (SHANXI APPLIC CHEMICAL INST) [X] 1,4,9 * examples 1-5 *; | [X]JP2013213109 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [X] 4,9 * examples 1-30 *; | [X]JP2014004799 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [X] 1,4,9 * tables 1,3 *; | [X]JP2014005415 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [X] 1,4,9 * paragraphs [0054] - [0056]; claim 1; table 2 *; | [X]CN103772641 (CHENGDU XINJIN TUOZHAN PRINTING INK CO LTD) [X] 1,4,9 * examples 1-6 *; | [XI]JP2014198828 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,9 * tables 1,2,5 * [I] 3,7; | [X]US2015197649 (OYA TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,9 * examples 1-12; table 1 *; | [X]CN104927036 (GUANGDONG SKY DRAGON PRINTING INK GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1,4,9 * examples 1-4,7 *; | [X]JP2016196550 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [X] 1,4,9 * examples 1-28; table 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2016150941 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0001], [0010]-[0012], [0020]-[0022], [0027]-[0031], [0043], embodiments (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2016150942 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0001], [0009]-[0011], [0019]-[0021], [0026]-[0030], [0042], embodiments (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2016150943 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0001], [0010]- [0012], [0020]-[0022], [0027]-[0031], [0043], embodiments (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2015068412 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0010], [0018]-[0023], [0029]-[0031], [0036]-[0038], embodiments & CN 105705595 A *; | [Y]JP2014214246 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0014], [0019], [0027], [0031]-[0049], [0057], embodiments (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2011225863 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM) [Y] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0014], [0032], embodiments, paragraph [0089] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2011225851 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0026]-[0029], [0447], embodiments & US 2013/0035448 A1, claims, paragraphs [0027]-[0030], [0450], examples & EP2554559 A1 & CN 102822223 A & KR 10-2013-0009819 A & CN 104892884 A * | by applicant | JP2014037552 | JP2011225851 | JP2015096621 |