EP3554404 - DEVICES AND THE USE THEREOF IN METHODS FOR ABLATION THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanospectra Biosciences, Inc. 8285 El Rio, Suite 150 Houston, TX 77054 / US | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODRICH, Glenn, Patrick 8285 El Rio Street Ste. 150 Houston, TX 77054 / US | 02 /
SCHWARTZ, Jon, Alexander 8285 El Rio Street Ste. 150 Houston, TX 77054 / US | 03 /
MURPHY, Andrew, Mark 8285 El Rio Street Ste. 150 Houston, TX 77054 / US | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P. Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17880274.0 | 14.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017US66522 | Priority number, date | US201662435431P | 16.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662435431 P | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018112261 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3554404 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/20, A61B18/22, A61B18/24, A61N5/06, A61N5/067, // A61B18/04, A61B18/00 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
A61B18/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/28 (KR,US);
A61B17/3415 (US);
A61B18/24 (US);
A61K41/0028 (US);
A61K41/0052 (KR,US);
A61K9/0009 (US);
A61K9/0019 (KR,US);
A61K9/5115 (KR,US);
A61M25/0662 (US);
A61N5/0601 (KR);
A61N5/0603 (US);
A61N5/062 (US);
A61N5/0625 (EP,KR,US);
A61N5/067 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (KR);
A61B18/04 (US);
A61B2017/00973 (KR);
A61B2018/00011 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00023 (US);
A61B2018/00547 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00589 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00821 (EP,KR);
A61B2018/2005 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/2205 (US);
A61B2018/2253 (KR);
A61B2018/2261 (EP,KR,US);
A61N2005/0612 (KR);
A61N2005/063 (EP,KR,US);
A61N2005/0659 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | A61B18/00, A61B18/18, A61B18/20, A61B18/22, A61B18/24, A61N5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON IN VERFAHREN ZUR ABLATIONSTHERAPIE | [2019/43] | English: | DEVICES AND THE USE THEREOF IN METHODS FOR ABLATION THERAPY | [2019/43] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES PROCÉDÉS DE THÉRAPIE D'ABLATION | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 08.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5797901 (COSMESCU IOAN [US]); | [XYI]US6039728 (BERLIEN HANS-PETER [DE], et al) | International search | [Y]US2003060813 (LOEB MARVIN P [US], et al); | [Y]US2006084960 (MESTER DANA R [US], et al); | [A]US2009240242 (NEUBERGER WOLFGANG [AE]); | [A]US2011052672 (KRISHNAN SUNIL [US], et al); | [A]US2015018807 (KIRCHER MORITZ [US], et al); | [XY]US2015094698 (GOWDA ASHOK [US], et al) |