EP3556533 - PLATE-SHAPED MOLDED BODY MANUFACTURING METHOD, MOLD, AND RUNNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMATSU, Shintaro 2-21-6-102, Umezono Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 3050045 / JP | 02 /
SAKAI, Taiga c/o Sumitomo Chemical Company Limited 6 Kitahara Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-3294 / JP | 03 /
MAEDA, Mitsuo c/o Sumitomo Chemical Company Limited 27-1 Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17880379.7 | 14.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017JP44893 | Priority number, date | JP20160243453 | 15.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016243453 | [2019/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018110646 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556533 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/27, B29C45/00, // B29K105/00 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
B29C45/0046 (EP,CN);
B29C45/0001 (EP,CN);
B29C45/2602 (US);
B29C45/27 (US);
B29C45/2708 (EP,CN);
B29C2045/2714 (EP,CN);
B29K2105/0079 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | B29C45/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR PLATTENFÖRMIGEN FORMKÖRPER, FORM UND ANGUSSKANAL | [2019/43] | English: | PLATE-SHAPED MOLDED BODY MANUFACTURING METHOD, MOLD, AND RUNNER | [2019/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CORPS MOULÉ EN FORME DE PLAQUE, MOULE ET CANAL DE COULÉE | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2019 | Translation filed | 13.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 11.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/38] | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH09141701 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0003] - [0033]; figures 1-23 * [I] 5; | [X]JPH1158478 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-3,8,9 * paragraphs [0005] - [0024] * * figures 2, 3 *; | [X]JPH0740391 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-3,8,9 * paragraphs [0006] - [0012]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [XY]JPH09141701 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-3, 8-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0005], [0024], fig. 10, 26 (Family: none) * [Y] 1-7; | [Y]JP2001054920 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 4-7 * , paragraph [0013], fig. 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2010012770 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD) [X] 1, 3, 8-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0032]-[0033], [0085], fig. 14 (Family: none) * [Y] 2, 4-7; | [XY]JPH1158478 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 8-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0001]-[0012], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) * [Y] 1-7 | by applicant | JPH07126383 | - KOIDE NAOYUKI'S, Synthesis, molding, and application of liquid crystal polymers, CMC Publishing Co., Ltd., (19870605), vol. 95, page 95 | JP20160243453 |