EP3555627 - FIBROBLAST ACTIVATION PROTEIN (FAP)-TARGETED IMAGING AND THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purdue Research Foundation 101 Foundry Drive, Suite 2500 West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [2023/45] |
Former [2019/43] | For all designated states Purdue Research Foundation 1801 Newman Road West Lafayette, IN 47906-4182 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOW, Philip Stewart 1801 Newman Road West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | 02 /
ROY, Jyoti 1801 Newman Road West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17880889.5 | 13.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017US65995 | Priority number, date | US201662434380P | 14.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662434380 P | US201762575050P | 20.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762575050 P | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018111989 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3555627 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3555627 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, A61K49/00, A61K51/04, G01N33/58, A61K47/55, A61P35/00, A61P35/04, G01N33/569 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
G01N33/574 (EP);
A61K47/545 (CN);
A61K51/0497 (EP,US);
A61K45/00 (CN);
A61K47/55 (EP,US);
A61K47/65 (CN);
A61K49/0032 (EP,US);
A61K49/0043 (EP,US);
A61K49/0052 (EP,CN,US);
A61K49/0056 (CN);
A61K49/04 (CN);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | G01N33/574, A61K49/00, A61K51/04, G01N33/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF FIBROBLASTENAKTIVIERUNGSPROTEIN (FAP) GERICHTETE BILDGEBUNG UND THERAPIE | [2019/43] | English: | FIBROBLAST ACTIVATION PROTEIN (FAP)-TARGETED IMAGING AND THERAPY | [2019/43] | French: | IMAGERIE ET THÉRAPIE CIBLÉES PAR UNE PROTÉINE D'ACTIVATION DES FIBROBLASTES (FAP) | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 15.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | MC | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | LU | 13.12.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SK | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2019083990 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]); | International search | [A]US2003138432 (GLAZIER ARNOLD [US]); | [A]US2011117025 (DACOSTA RALPH SEBASTIAN [CA], et al); | [A]US2014099340 (JUNE CARL H [US], et al); | [A]US2014271482 (LOW PHILIP S [US], et al) |