EP3554487 - XENOBIOTIC-FREE CULTURE SYSTEM TO EXPAND HUMAN LIMBAL STEM CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENG, Sophie Xiaohui 100 Stein Plaza Los Angeles, California 90095 / US | 02 /
GONZALEZ, Sheyla 411 Kelton Avenue Apt. 133 Los Angeles, California 90024 / US | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Hutter, Anton, et al Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/43] | Hutter, Anton, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17881442.2 | 12.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017US65869 | Priority number, date | US201662433626P | 13.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662433626 P | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018111908 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3554487 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, C12M1/00, C12M1/12, C12N5/02, C12N5/071 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
C12M99/00 (EP);
C12N5/0056 (US);
A61K31/137 (EP);
A61K31/573 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
C12M1/00 (EP);
C12M1/12 (EP);
C12N5/0607 (US);
C12N2500/25 (US);
C12N2500/35 (US);
C12N2500/46 (US);
C12N2500/98 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | XENOBIOTIKFREIES KULTURSYSTEM ZUR ERWEITERUNG VON MENSCHLICHEN LIMBUSSTAMMZELLEN | [2019/43] | English: | XENOBIOTIC-FREE CULTURE SYSTEM TO EXPAND HUMAN LIMBAL STEM CELLS | [2019/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CULTURE SANS XÉNOBIOTIQUE POUR FAIRE CROÎTRE DES CELLULES SOUCHES LIMBIQUES HUMAINES | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 22.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]ES2409537 (UNIV VALLADOLID [ES], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0183] * [I] 9; | [XI]US2016060595 (MIKHAILOVA ALEXANDRA [FI], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,11,14 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0099] * * Claims * [I] 9; | [A] - ABOULGHASSEM SHAHDADFAR ET AL, "Ex?vivo expanded autologous limbal epithelial cells on amniotic membrane using a culture medium with human serum as single supplement", EXPERIMENTAL EYE RESEARCH, (20120401), vol. 97, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.exer.2012.01.013, ISSN 0014-4835, pages 1 - 9, XP055179671 [A] 1,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exer.2012.01.013 | International search | [A]US6162643 (WILLE JR JOHN J [US]) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2009047738 (SHIMMURA SHIGETO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2015175965 (DENG SOPHIE XIAOHUI [US], et al) [Y] 9, 17 * entire document *; | [Y]US9132087 (LICHTER JAY [US], et al) [Y] 20 * entire document *; | [XY]US2016060595 (MIKHAILOVA ALEXANDRA [FI], et al) [X] 1, 3, 4, 60 * entire document * [Y] 2, 5, 7, 9-20; | [Y]GB2531492 (UNIV NEWCASTLE [GB], et al) [Y] 2, 5, 7, 10-19 * entire document * |