EP3556792 - PH-RESPONSIVE POLYMER AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo Institute of Technology 2-12-1, Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIYAMA Nobuhiro c/o TOKYO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-12-1 Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | 02 /
TAKEMOTO Hiroyasu c/o TOKYO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-12-1 Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | 03 /
RANNEH Abdul-Hackam c/o TOKYO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-12-1 Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | 04 /
TOMODA Keishiro c/o TOKYO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-12-1 Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | 05 /
NOMOTO Takahiro c/o TOKYO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-12-1 Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | 06 /
MATSUI Makoto c/o TOKYO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-12-1 Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17881482.8 | 05.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017JP43604 | Priority number, date | JP20160243749 | 15.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016243749 | [2019/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018110366 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556792 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/48, A61K47/59, C08G69/10 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
C08G69/10 (EP);
A61K47/59 (EP,US);
C08G69/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | C08G69/48, A61K47/59 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | PH-REAKTIVES POLYMER UND WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/43] | English: | PH-RESPONSIVE POLYMER AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2019/43] | French: | POLYMÈRE SENSIBLE AU PH ET SYSTÈME DE LIBÉRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2019 | Translation filed | 07.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 11.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2003286344 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [X] 1-5,12-15 * abstract * * example - * * paragraph [0014] *[A] 6-11,16 | International search | [A]JP2000086757 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN) [A] 1-16* (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2010093036 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * & US 2012/0053295 A1 & EP 2399948 A1 *; | [A]JP2011231220 (UNIV TOKYO) [A] 1-16 * (Family: none) *; | [XA] - IWASAKI, TAKASHI et al., "Cellular uptake and in vivo distribution of polyhistidine peptides", Journal of Controlled Release, (20150727), vol. 210, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 115 - 124, XP029217581 [X] 1-2, 6-8, 12, 14-16 [A] 3-5, 9-11, 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2015.05.268 | [A] - TANGSANGASAKSRI, MONTIRA et al., "siRNA-Loaded Polyion Complex Micelle Decorated with Charge-Conversional Polymer Tuned to Undergo Stepwise Response to Intra-Tumoral and Intra-Endosomal", Biomacromolecules, (20151130), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 246 - 255, XP055495444 [A] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.biomac.5b01334 | by applicant | - KNOP K. et al., "Poly(ethylene glycol) in drug delivery: pros and cons as well as potential alterations", Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20100000), vol. 49, pages 6288 - 6208 | JP20160243749 |