EP3555020 - AGE-RESISTANT ASPHALT COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blacklidge Emulsions Inc. Suite 200, 12251 Bernard Parkway Gulfport, Mississippi 39503 / US | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLACKLIDGE, Brittany 9346 Stone Road Gulfport, Mississippi 39503 / US | 02 /
ALLEN, R. Grover 13040 Holly Springs Avenue Biloxi, Mississippi 39532 / US | 03 /
CUEVAS, Henry 6670 Red Creek Road Long Beach, Mississippi 39560 / US | [2023/19] |
Former [2019/43] | 01 /
BLACKLIDGE, Brittany 9346 Stone Road Gulfport Mississippi 39503 / US | ||
02 /
ALLEN, R. Grover 13040 Holly Springs Avenue Biloxi Mississippi 39532 / US | |||
03 /
CUEVAS, Henry 6670 Red Creek Road Long Beach Mississippi 39560 / US | Representative(s) | Baldwin, Mark Firebird IP 27 Old Gloucester Street London WC1N 3AX / GB | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17882948.7 | 18.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017US67138 | Priority number, date | US201662436306P | 19.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662436306 P | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018118820 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3555020 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C04B26/26, C04B24/36, C04B111/20 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP,US);
C10C3/026 (US);
G01N33/42 (EP,US);
C08L2555/10 (US);
C08L2555/64 (US);
C08L2555/72 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L91/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | ALTERUNGSBESTÄNDIGE ASPHALTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2019/43] | English: | AGE-RESISTANT ASPHALT COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2019/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ASPHALTE RÉSISTANTES AU VIEILLISSEMENT ET PROCÉDÉS | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 15.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.03.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.03.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 15.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA1321276 (ZANZOTTO LUDO [CA]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US2010275817 (WILLIAMS RONALD CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * example 1 * | International search | [A]US2009133604 (FISCHER HARTMUT RUDOLF [NL], et al) [A] 1-45 * See paragraph [0024]; and claims 1, 15, 19. *; | [A]US2010275817 (WILLIAMS RONALD CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-45* See paragraphs [0005], [0046]; and claims 1, 6, 18, 32. *; | [A]EP2487207 (WORTELBOER JOHAN PETRUS [NL], et al) [A] 1-45 * See claims 1, 12, 13, 19. *; | [A]US2015008156 (MARTIN CAROLINE [BE], et al) [A] 1-45 * See paragraph [0005]; claims 1-6, 11; and table 1. *; | [X]US2016362338 (REINKE GERALD H [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * See paragraphs [0059], [0061], [0088], [0114], [0124], [0144], [0168]; claims 1, 11; and figures 6, 7, 13. * |