EP3549272 - IMPROVED CROSSTALK CHANNEL ESTIMATION FOR LEGACY CPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Haixiang 2330 Central Expressway Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | 02 /
HE, Yujie 2330 Central Expressway Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | 03 /
TU, Jianping 2330 Central Expressway Santa Clara, California 95050 / US | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 17883547.6 | 19.12.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017CN117231 | Priority number, date | US201662436219P | 19.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662436219 P | US201715410131 | 19.01.2017 Original published format: US201715410131 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018113674 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3549272 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/32, H04L1/00 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
H04B3/32 (EP,US);
H04L25/03343 (EP,US);
H04L27/2626 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE ÜBERSPRECHUNGSKANALBEURTEILUNG FÜR LEGACY-CPE | [2019/41] | English: | IMPROVED CROSSTALK CHANNEL ESTIMATION FOR LEGACY CPE | [2019/41] | French: | ESTIMATION DE CANAL DE DIAPHONIE AMÉLIORÉE POUR CPE HÉRITÉ | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 16.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014140187 (WANG XIANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0068] *; | [A]US2015163350 (SHI CAO [CN], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0100] *; | [A]EP3062448 (LANTIQ BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XAI] - "G.Vector: A Backward-Compatible Crosstalk Channel Estimation Method for Downstream Vectoring;BF-065", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2005-2008, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20071203), vol. 4/15, pages 1 - 9, XP017532093 [X] 1,7-9 * the whole document * [A] 3-6,11-14 [I] 2,10 |