EP3564424 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A MULTI-DRUM WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/45] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MULTI-DRUM WASHING MACHINE | ||
[2023/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QINGDAO HAIER LAUNDRY ELECTRIC APPLIANCES CO., LTD. South of Tuanjie Road West of Zonger Road Huangdao District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | For all designated states HAIER SMART HOME CO., LTD. No. 1, Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2023/45] |
Former [2019/45] | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Drum Washing Machine Co., Ltd. No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Wenwei No. 1 Haier Road Hi-Tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
WU, Jun No. 1 Haier Road Hi-Tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 03 /
CAI, Rongshuai No. 1 Haier Road Hi-Tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Haibo No. 1 Haier Road Hi-Tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Guangfeng No. 1 Haier Road Hi-Tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Yubao No. 1 Haier Road Hi-Tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 07 /
PAN, Guanghui No. 1 Haier Road Hi-Tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Ziebig Hengelhaupt Intellectual Property Attorneys Patentanwaltskanzlei PartGmbB Leipziger Straße 49 10117 Berlin / DE | [2023/48] |
Former [2019/45] | Ziebig & Hengelhaupt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Leipziger Straße 49 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 17883928.8 | 21.12.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017CN117631 | Priority number, date | CN201611191698 | 21.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611191698 | [2019/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018113715 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564424 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3564424 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D06F31/00, D06F33/36, D06F19/00, // D06F29/00, D06F43/04, D06F103/24, D06F105/48, D06F105/54 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
D06F33/36 (EP,CN,US);
D06F33/00 (CN,US);
D06F19/00 (EP,CN,US);
D06F23/00 (US);
D06F29/00 (EP,US);
D06F31/00 (EP,US);
D06F31/005 (CN,US);
D06F37/02 (US);
D06F43/04 (EP,US);
D06F2103/24 (EP,CN,US);
D06F2105/48 (EP,CN,US);
D06F2105/54 (EP,CN,US);
Y02B40/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | D06F31/00, // D06F19/00, D06F29/00, D06F43/04 | ||
Former IPC [2019/45] | D06F19/00, D06F43/04, D06F31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER MEHRTROMMELWASCHMASCHINE | [2019/45] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A MULTI-DRUM WASHING MACHINE | [2023/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE MACHINE À LAVER À PLUSIEURS TAMBOURS | [2023/28] |
Former [2019/45] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MULTI-DRUM WASHING MACHINE | ||
Former [2019/45] | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE MACHINE À LAVER À PLUSIEURS TAMBOURS | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2019 | Translation filed | 17.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 10.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | MC | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SK | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2010275381 (KO HONG SEOK [KR], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0003] - [0016] - [0048] - [0052] - [0059] - [0066] - [0081] - [0088]; figure -; claim - * [A] 9-11; | [A]US2015211173 (LEE SANGWOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0003] , [0033] - [0060] - [0092] - [0113]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP2980297 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0006] , [0033] , [0034] , [0040] - [0049]; figure -; claim - * |