EP3561041 - MIXING DEVICE FOR CELL PRINTING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T&R Biofab Co., Ltd. Sangidaehak-ro 237 540 Siheung-si, Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | For all designated states Korea Polytechnic University Industry Academic Cooperation Foundation 237 Sangidaehak-ro Siheung-si, Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHN, Geunseon 540, KOREA POLYTECHNIC UNIVERSITY Smart Hub Sanhakyunghapbonbu Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si, Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | 02 /
SHIM, Jinhyung Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jeongseok 540, KOREA POLYTECHNIC UNIVERSITY Smart Hub Sanhakyunghapbonbu Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si, Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Ingyu 540, KOREA POLYTECHNIC UNIVERSITY Smart Hub Sanhakyunghapbonbu Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si, Gyeonggi-do 15073 Siheung-si, Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | 05 /
MIN, Kyunghyun Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | 06 /
JIN, Songwan 540, KOREA POLYTECHNIC UNIVERSITY Smart Hub Sanhakyunghapbonbu Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si, Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | 07 /
YUN, Wonsoo 540, KOREA POLYTECHNIC UNIVERSITY Smart Hub Sanhakyunghapbonbu Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si, Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/44] | 01 /
AHN, Geunseon Sangidaehak-ro 237 540 Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | ||
02 /
SHIM, Jinhyung Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Jeongseok Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Ingyu Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | |||
05 /
MIN, Kyunghyun Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | |||
06 /
JIN, Songwan Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | |||
07 /
YUN, Wonsoo Sangidaehak-ro 237 Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 15073 / KR | Representative(s) | Kastel, Stefan Kastel Patentanwälte St.-Cajetan-Straße 41 81669 München / DE | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 17884741.4 | 15.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017KR14829 | Priority number, date | KR20160177709 | 23.12.2016 Original published format: KR 20160177709 | [2019/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018117540 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3561041 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3561041 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/06, B01F7/18, B01F7/24, B01F15/00, C12M1/26, B05C17/005, B29C64/106, B29C64/112, B29C64/209, B33Y30/00 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
C12M33/00 (EP,US);
C12M27/02 (KR,US);
B01F35/7174 (US);
B01F27/90 (EP,KR,US);
B01F27/92 (EP,KR,US);
B01F35/32005 (EP,KR,US);
B01F35/50 (EP,KR);
B05C17/00566 (EP,US);
B33Y40/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01F2101/44 (EP,KR,US);
B01F35/33 (US);
B05C17/0133 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | C12M1/06, B01F7/18, B01F7/24, B01F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHVORRICHTUNG FÜR ZELLENDRUCKZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2019/44] | English: | MIXING DEVICE FOR CELL PRINTING COMPOSITION | [2019/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MÉLANGE DESTINÉ À UNE COMPOSITION D'IMPRESSION DE CELLULES | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2019 | Translation filed | 25.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 08.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2017 | AL | 21.07.2021 | AT | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | DK | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | ES | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | IT | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | MK | 21.07.2021 | MT | 21.07.2021 | NL | 21.07.2021 | PL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SE | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | TR | 21.07.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | GR | 22.10.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | IE | 15.12.2021 | LU | 15.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 15.12.2017 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
MK | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
TR | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 15.12.2017 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
MK | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 15.12.2017 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6854349 (BRANDHORST GERD [DE], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [XYI]US2014036616 (GHOSH DIPAKNAR [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 16] , [0 28] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0146] * * paragraphs [0148] , [ 157] , [ 158] * * figures 1-6a * [Y] 9 [I] 2-8; | [YA]US2014257179 (SCHWAB JUSTIN [US], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-8 | International search | KR100766619B [a] (SEOUL NAT UNIV IND FOUNDATION [KR]) [a] 1-9; | KR101362293B [a] [a] 1-9; | KR101451794B [a] (3D KOREA CO LTD [KR]) [a] 1-9; | KR20150136892 [a] (NAT UNIV CHONBUK IND COOP FOUND [KR]) [a] 1-9; | JP2016526910 [a][a] 1-9 |