EP3558811 - OFFSHORE WIND KITE WITH SEAFLOOR MOORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makani Technologies LLC 2175 Monarch Street Alameda, CA 94501 / US | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HACHTMANN, Brian 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
FELKER, Fort 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
NORDSTROM, Charles 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Anderson, Oliver Ben, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 17885355.2 | 12.10.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017US56326 | Priority number, date | US201615387261 | 21.12.2016 Original published format: US201615387261 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018118192 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3558811 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B63B35/50, B63B21/50, B64C39/02, F03D9/25, F03D5/00, // B64F3/00, B64F3/02 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
B63B35/50 (EP,US);
B63B21/50 (EP,US);
B64F3/00 (EP,US);
B64U10/60 (EP,US);
F03D9/25 (EP,US);
G05D1/0684 (EP,US);
B64F3/02 (EP,US);
B64U70/30 (US);
B64U70/93 (US);
F03D13/25 (EP,US);
F03D5/00 (EP,US);
F03D9/32 (EP,US);
F05B2240/921 (EP,US);
F05B2240/923 (US);
F05B2240/93 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | B63B35/50, B63B21/50, B64C39/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | OFFSHORE-WINDDRACHE MIT MEERESBODENVERANKERUNG | [2019/44] | English: | OFFSHORE WIND KITE WITH SEAFLOOR MOORING | [2019/44] | French: | CERF-VOLANT EN MER À AMARRAGE SUR FOND MARIN | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 27.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009236470 (GOOSSEN EMRAY R [US], et al); | [Y]US2010032948 (BEVIRT JOEBEN [US]); | [A]US2011266395 (BEVIRT JOEBEN [US]); | [YA]US2015158598 (YOU KYUHYONG [KR]); | [A]US9139310 (WANG MINGXI [CN]); | [YA]EP2963519 (BOEING CO [US]); | [A]US2016318628 (VANDER LIND DAMON [US]) | International search | [XY]US2010032948 (BEVIRT JOEBEN [US]); | [A]US2014032034 (RAPTOPOULOS ANDREAS [GB], et al); | [A]US2015158598 (YOU KYUHYONG [KR]); | [Y]US9139310 (WANG MINGXI [CN]); | [Y]US2016318628 (VANDER LIND DAMON [US]) |