EP3562942 - MODIFIED CRISPR RNA AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ionis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | For all designated states Ludwig Institute For Cancer Research 666 Third Avenue New York, NY 10017 / US | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHDAR, Meghdad 2855 Gazelle Ct. Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 02 /
PRAKASH, Thazha, P. 2855 Gazelle Ct. Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 03 /
SWAYZE, Eric, E. 2855 Gazelle Ct. Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 04 /
BENNETT, C., Frank 2855 Gazelle Ct. Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 05 /
MCMAHON, Moira, A. 2855 Gazelle Ct. Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | Holland, David Christopher Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17886910.3 | 28.12.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017US68642 | Priority number, date | US201662439828P | 28.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662439828 P | US201762491818P | 28.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762491818 P | US201762572361P | 13.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762572361 P | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018125964 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562942 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N15/10 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N2310/20 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (US);
C12N2310/322 (US);
C12N2310/3231 (EP,US);
C12N2310/346 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP);
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3533 (EP) |
Former IPC [2019/45] | C12N15/11, C12P19/34, C07H21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE CRISPR-RNA UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2019/45] | English: | MODIFIED CRISPR RNA AND USES THEREOF | [2019/45] | French: | CRISPR-ARN MODIFIÉ ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 23.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 29.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2016123230 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) [I] 1-3,5-10,12-15 * figures 10-13; example 12; claims 1-4, 10 * * the whole document * [A] 4,11; | [XAI]CN106244591 (SUZHOU GENEPHARMA CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6-8,12-14 * claims 1-10; table 1 * * the whole document * [A] 4,5,9-11 [I] 15; | [XAI]WO2016205711 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0225] , [ 324] * * the whole document * [A] 9,11 [I] 5; | [XPI]WO2017004261 (IONIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [XP] 1-8,10,12-15 * example 9; claims 164-273, 277-282, 285, 290 * * the whole document * [I] 9,11; | [XP]WO2017181107 (OHIO STATE INNOVATION FOUNDATION [US]) [XP] 1-15 * figures 9, 15, 18; example 1; table 2 * * the whole document *; | [E]WO2018098383 (INTEGRATED DNA TECH INC [US]) [E] 1-15 * figures 7, 8; tables 6-10 ** the whole document *; | [XPI] - BIN LI ET AL, "Engineering CRISPR-Cpf1 crRNAs and mRNAs to maximize genome editing efficiency", NATURE BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (20170510), vol. 1, no. 5, doi:10.1038/s41551-017-0066, pages 1 - 21, XP055564263 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * [I] 15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41551-017-0066 | [P] - BIN LI ET AL, "Engineering CRISPR-Cpf1 crRNAs and mRNAs to maximize genome editing efficiency - Suppl. Information", NATURE BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (20170510), vol. 1, no. 5, doi:10.1038/s41551-017-0066, pages 1 - 19, XP055745200 [P] * figure S6; table S1 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41551-017-0066 | International search | [A]US2015376587 (MAY ANDREW PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 6/1-5, 7/1-5, 8/1-4 * ' *; | [A]US2016024524 (JOUNG J KEITH [US], et al)[A] 1-5, 6/1-5, 7/1-5, 8/1-4; | [X]US2016289675 (RYAN DANIEL E [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 6/1-5, 7/1-5, 8/1-4 * ; paragraphs [0022], ' [0025], [0042], [0048], [0057], [0063], [0171], [0173], [0254], [0293], [0294], [0393] * |