EP3559936 - MULTI-LAYER DISPLAY INCLUDING PROXIMITY SENSOR AND DEPTH-CHANGING INTERFACE ELEMENTS, AND/OR ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies AG Spitalstrasse 5 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2024/39] |
Former [2024/18] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies AG Pestalozzistrasse 2 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2022/24] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited The Financial Services Centre Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | ||
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states Pure Depth Limited Level 2, 5 Broadway New Market Auckland 1023 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANS, Richard N. 3 Ngaruawahia Road Ngaruawahia 3720 / NZ | 02 /
NG, Sok-Mung 6A Waratah Street Birkenhead Auckland 0626 / NZ | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 17887023.4 | 18.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017IB58075 | Priority number, date | US201615393297 | 29.12.2016 Original published format: US201615393297 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018122674 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3559936 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00, G06F3/00, G06F3/038 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G09G3/003 (US);
G06F3/04815 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (US);
G06F3/04845 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE ANZEIGE MIT NÄHERUNGSSENSOR- UND TIEFENVERÄNDERNDEN SCHNITTSTELLENELEMENTEN UND/ODER ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2019/44] | English: | MULTI-LAYER DISPLAY INCLUDING PROXIMITY SENSOR AND DEPTH-CHANGING INTERFACE ELEMENTS, AND/OR ASSOCIATED METHODS | [2019/44] | French: | AFFICHEUR MULTICOUCHE COMPRENANT UN CAPTEUR DE PROXIMITÉ ET DES ÉLÉMENTS D'INTERFACE DE CHANGEMENT DE PROFONDEUR, ET/OU PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 03.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 14.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011082620 (SMALL EVAN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013015466 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [A]US2014062946 (GRAUMANN DAVID L [US], et al); | [XYI]US2016049109 (ENGEL GABRIEL DAMON [NZ], et al); | [E]WO2018041489 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [E]WO2018122670 (PURE DEPTH LTD [NZ]) | International search | [A]US2003137469 (HANSEN JILL ANN [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 12-16 * entire document *; | [A]US2011054785 (WOOD MICHAEL WESLEY [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 12-16* entire document *; | [Y]US2011157040 (KASHIO HIROKAZU [JP]) [Y] 16 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011164047 (PANCE ALEKSANDAR [US]) [Y] 1-3, 12-16 * entire document *; | [A]US8630741 (MATSUOKA YOKY [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 12-16 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2015042048 (AMAZON TECH INC [US]) [Y] 2, 3, 12, 14-16 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016127775 (ZILBERSTEIN KARIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 12-16 * entire document * | by applicant | WO9942889 | WO9944095 | US2011082620 | US2011310121 | US2012056989 | WO2013015466 | US2014062946 | US8711058 | US2015363070 | US2016049109 | WO2018041489 | WO2018122670 |