EP3556959 - SELF-ADHESIVE PROFILE FOR THE ASSEMBLY OF CONSTRUCTION BLOCKS PRODUCED IN GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Talleres Foro, S.A. Av.Manuel Escobedo 2 12200 Onda / ES | For all designated states Calvo Hernandez, Ana Maria Av. Manuel Escobedo n.2 12200 Onda / ES | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALVO HERNANDEZ, Ana Maria Av.Manuel Escobedo 2 12200 Onda / ES | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Espiell Gomez, Ignacio R. Volart Pons y Cia., S.L. Pau Claris, 77 2º 1ª 08010 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/43] | Chanza Jordan, Dionisio Plaza Alfonso el Magnanimo, 13 46003 Valencia / ES | Application number, filing date | 17887255.2 | 27.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017ES70855 | Priority number, date | ES20160031742 | 30.12.2016 Original published format: ES 201631742 | [2019/43] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018122436 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | ES | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556959 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04C1/42, E04B2/02, // E04C2/54 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
E04B2/06 (EP);
E04C1/42 (EP,ES);
E04B2/02 (ES);
E04B2002/0247 (EP);
E04C2/546 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | E04C1/42, E04B2/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Validation states | MA | 17.07.2019 | TN | 17.07.2019 | Title | German: | SELBSTKLEBENDES PROFIL ZUR MONTAGE VON AUS GLAS HERGESTELLTEN BAUSTEINEN | [2019/43] | English: | SELF-ADHESIVE PROFILE FOR THE ASSEMBLY OF CONSTRUCTION BLOCKS PRODUCED IN GLASS | [2019/43] | French: | PROFILÉ AUTOADHÉSIF POUR LE MONTAGE DE BLOCS DE CONSTRUCTION FABRIQUÉS EN VERRE | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2019 | Translation filed | 17.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 22.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/33] | 13.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.2020 | 31.12.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004083549 (PROFFER GLASS ENGROS AS [NO], et al) [A] 1 * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 11; figures 1-6 * * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 12 * * page 11, line 11 - page 12, line 9 *; | [A]US2005241268 (TJAKRA HORACE [US]) [A] 1* page 1, paragraphs [0015]-[0016]; figures 1-6 *; | [I]USD513966S (WRIGHT BRIAN C [US]) [I] 1 * figures 1-8 * | International search | [A]WO9505510 (WIRKUS RANDOLF ANDREW [AU], et al) [A] 1* , page 7, line 2 - page 14, line 5; figures. *; | [X]US5485702 (SHOLTON BERNARD C [US]) [X] 1 * , column 4, line 20 - column 7, line 39; figures 3 - 6B. *; | [A]US5845443 (WIRKUS RANDOLF ANDREW [AU], et al) [A] 1 * , column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 3; figures. * | [X] - GLASSBLOCK TECHNOLOGY, (20161106), URL: http://www.glassbolocks.co.uk/si_Easifix_accessories_spacer.btm, (20170913) [X] 1 * . the whole document. * | [X] - LEROY MERLIN, (20161023), URL: http://www.leroymerlin.es/produetos/construccion/bloquesdevidrio/instalar-bloques-of-vidrio.html, (20170913) [X] 1 * the whole document. * | by applicant | US5485702 |