EP3562543 - STIMULATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nalu Medical, Inc. 1525 Faraday Avenue Suite 180 Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2024/29] |
Former [2019/45] | For all designated states Nalu Medical, Inc. 1525 Faraday Avenue Suite 180 Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIT, Ji-Jon 107 Petir Rd 22-17 Singapore 678275 / SG | 02 /
PIVONKA, Daniel, M. 128 Via Morella Encinitas California 92024 / US | [2019/48] |
Former [2019/45] | 01 /
SIT, Ji-Jon 909 Wind Drift Drive Carlsbad California 92011 / US | ||
02 /
PIVONKA, Daniel, M. 128 Via Morella Encinitas California 92024 / US | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2024/29] |
Former [2019/45] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17887576.1 | 28.12.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017US68803 | Priority number, date | US201662441056P | 30.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662441056 P | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018126062 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562543 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3562543 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61N1/372 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
A61N1/37247 (EP);
A61N1/37252 (US);
A61N1/05 (US);
A61N1/08 (US);
A61N1/36 (EP);
A61N1/36062 (EP);
A61N1/362 (EP);
A61N1/372 (EP);
A61N1/37229 (EP,US);
A61N1/37264 (EP);
A61N1/378 (US);
H04B5/72 (EP);
H04B5/79 (EP);
A61N1/37235 (US);
A61N1/3787 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STIMULATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/45] | English: | STIMULATION APPARATUS | [2019/45] | French: | APPAREIL DE STIMULATION | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 29.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24188096.2 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006074450 (BOVEJA BIRINDER R [US], et al); | [A]US2012197352 (CARBUNARU RAFAEL [US], et al); | [X]WO2016127130 (NALU MEDICAL INC [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2003055406 (LEBEL RONALD J [US], et al); | [Y]US2010168817 (YAMAMOTO JOYCE K [US], et al); | [XY]WO2016127130 (NALU MEDICAL INC [US], et al) | Examination | US2008143619 | US2011234155 | by applicant | WO2016127130 |