EP3562634 - IMPROVED HANDHELD POWER TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELIN, Patrik Ollonborrvägen 12 561 48 Huskvarna / SE | 02 /
HAGBERG, Albin Solstickegatan 12 553 14 Jönköping / SE | 03 /
LANDÈN, Göran Videgatan 12 561 38 Huskvarna / SE | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 17888314.6 | 11.12.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017SE51241 | Priority number, date | SE20160051753 | 29.12.2016 Original published format: SE 1651753 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018124956 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562634 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B27B17/08, A01G23/08, B27B17/00, F16F15/04 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
B27B17/0033 (EP,SE,US);
B27B17/08 (EP,SE,US);
A01G23/08 (SE,US);
B27B17/00 (SE);
F16F15/1201 (EP,US);
B27B17/02 (US);
F16F15/04 (SE,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE HANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2019/45] | English: | IMPROVED HANDHELD POWER TOOL | [2019/45] | French: | OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE PORTATIF AMÉLIORÉ | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 08.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US975938 (DOWNEY DAVID H [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 3; figures 1,2,3; claim 1 *; | [X]US3059491 (HOFF HARRY J, et al) [X] 1-6,15 * figure 6 *; | [X]US3339596 (HAYO DEELMAN) [X] 1-6,15 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4321750 (SUGIHARA HIDEO) [A] 1-15* figure - *; | [X]US4348199 (OONUMA KOICHIRO, et al) [X] 1-14 * figure 7 *; | [X]JPS57173649 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * figure - *; | [X]US4869709 (NAGANO MASASHI [JP]) [X] 1-14 * column 4, lines 5-45 *; | [XI]EP1996838 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023]; figures 12, 13 * [I] 15 | International search | [XA]US3059491 (HOFF HARRY J, et al); | [XA]US3339596 (HAYO DEELMAN); | [A]US3410147 (SCOTT-JACKSON DENNIS G); | [A]US4321750 (SUGIHARA HIDEO) | by applicant | WO2007109420 |