EP3562580 - AN EXTRUDED HONEYCOMB CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | For all designated states BASF Corporation 100 Campus Drive Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Feng Room 524 Building 1 2388 Jingao Road Pudong Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
HUBER, Sabine Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
ZHANG, Jiadi 199 Luqiao Road Jinqiao Processing Zone Pudong Shanghai 201206 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Liang 199 Luqiao Road Jinqiao Processing Zone Pudong Shanghai 201206 / CN | 05 /
GALEANO NUNEZ, Diana Carolina Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
HUENNEKES, Edgar Viktor HV-HAN Seligmannallee 1 30173 Hannover / DE | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 17888606.5 | 28.12.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017CN119423 | Priority number, date | WO2016CN113637 | 30.12.2016 Original published format: PCT/CN2016/113637 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018121676 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562580 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, B01D53/86, B01J23/22, B01J23/847, B01J35/00, B01J35/04, B01J37/00, B01J37/04 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
B01D53/9418 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/8472 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/1642 (US);
A61B17/1671 (US);
A61B17/3403 (US);
A61B17/3421 (US);
A61B17/3468 (US);
A61B17/3472 (US);
A61B18/1206 (US);
A61B18/148 (US);
A61B18/1487 (US);
A61F7/007 (US);
B01D53/8628 (EP,US);
B01J21/063 (US);
B01J23/18 (KR);
B01J23/22 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/30 (US);
B01J23/78 (US);
B01J35/31 (EP);
B01J37/0009 (EP,KR);
B01J37/0018 (US);
B01J37/04 (US);
B01J37/08 (KR);
B01J37/088 (US);
A61B17/8805 (US);
A61B18/02 (US);
A61B18/1492 (US);
A61B18/16 (US);
A61B18/18 (US);
A61B2017/00331 (US);
A61B2017/3405 (US);
A61B2017/3454 (US);
A61B2018/00017 (US);
A61B2018/00339 (US);
A61B2018/0044 (US);
A61B2018/00565 (US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/126 (US);
A61B2018/1475 (US);
A61N1/0551 (US);
B01D2255/2065 (KR);
B01D2255/20707 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/20723 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/20776 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2098 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2255/30 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/45] | B01J23/84, B01J23/18, B01J23/22, B01J35/10, B01J37/04, B01D53/56, B01D53/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | EIN EXTRUDIERTER WABENKATALYSATOR | [2019/45] | English: | AN EXTRUDED HONEYCOMB CATALYST | [2019/45] | French: | CATALYSEUR EN NIDS D'ABEILLE EXTRUDÉ | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 01.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0351057 (CORNING INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,12,13,15 * page 2, lines 12-17 * * examples 25-30 * [A] 10; | [XI]US2016045868 (SONNTAG OLIVIER [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9,12-14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0037] , [0070] , [0082] , [0083] * * claims 1,3,7,15 * [I] 10; | [X]KR101631487B (HUR SUNG JU [KR]) [X] 1-9,11-13,15* paragraphs [0026] - [0031] *; | [XA]CN106111118 (SANLONG CATALYST CO LTD) [X] 1-9,11-13,15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0052] - [0057] * [A] 10 |