EP3569590 - (R)-4-HYDROXY-2-OXO-1-PYRROLIDINEACETAMIDE CRYSTAL FORM, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chongqing Ruzer Pharmaceutical Company Limited No. 9 Qinye Road Yubei Chongqing 401120 / CN | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YE, Lei No. 9 of Qinye Road Yubei Chongqing 401120 / CN | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 17891064.2 | 25.12.2017 | [2019/47] | WO2017CN118180 | Priority number, date | CN20171021990 | 12.01.2017 Original published format: CN201710021990 | [2019/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018130063 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3569590 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/273, A61K31/4015, A61P25/08 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
C07D207/273 (EP,CN,KR);
C07D207/46 (US);
A61K31/4015 (EP,KR);
A61K9/2095 (US);
A61K9/4858 (US);
A61P25/08 (EP,KR);
C07B2200/13 (CN,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Title | German: | (R)-4-HYDROXY-2-OXO-1-PYRROLIDINACETAMIDKRISTALLFORM, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/47] | English: | (R)-4-HYDROXY-2-OXO-1-PYRROLIDINEACETAMIDE CRYSTAL FORM, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2019/47] | French: | FORME CRISTALLINE DE (R)-4-HYDROXY-2-OXO-1-PYRROLIDINEACÉTAMIDE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON APPLICATION | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2019 | Translation filed | 12.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 01.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/49] | 04.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN102558014 (TIANJIN HANKANG PHARMACEUTICAL BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0051]; claim 1 *; | [A]CN103342673 (CSPC PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP OUYI PHARMA CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0021]; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2015067130 (CHONGQING RUNZE PHARMACEUTICAL [CN]) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0007] , [00 8] , [0 10]; example -; claim - *; | [XI] - CHEN; XUE; ET AL, "Synthesis of (R) 4-Hydroxy-Oxo-1-Pyrrolidineacetamide", JINGXI HUAGONG ZHONGJIANTI = FINE CHEMICAL INTERMEDIATES,, (20111031), vol. 41, no. 5, pages 21 - 23, XP009514833 [X] 9,15,16 * chapter 3, especially chapter 3.1 * [I] 1-8,10-14 |