EP3570341 - WHITE ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changchun Institute Of Applied Chemistry Chinese Academy Of Sciences No. 5625 Renmin Street Changchun, Jilin 130022 / CN | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Liang No. 5625 Renmin Street Changchun Jilin 130022 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Hongjie No. 5625 Renmin Street Changchun Jilin 130022 / CN | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17891345.5 | 18.08.2017 | [2019/47] | WO2017CN98010 | Priority number, date | CN20171032344 | 16.01.2017 Original published format: CN201710032344 | [2019/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018129922 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570341 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3570341 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/54 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
H10K85/611 (EP);
H10K50/125 (CN);
H10K50/13 (EP,CN,US);
H10K50/15 (US);
H10K50/18 (US);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K85/40 (US);
H10K85/615 (EP);
H10K85/622 (US);
H10K85/653 (EP,US);
H10K85/654 (US);
H10K85/656 (US);
H10K85/657 (EP);
H10K85/6572 (US);
H10K50/121 (EP,CN);
H10K50/80 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/47] | H01L51/50, H01L51/52, H01L51/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEISSE ORGANISCHE ELEKTROLUMINESZENZVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/47] | English: | WHITE ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DEVICE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE BLANC ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2019 | Translation filed | 15.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 29.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2017 | AL | 03.08.2022 | AT | 03.08.2022 | BG | 03.08.2022 | CY | 03.08.2022 | CZ | 03.08.2022 | DK | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | ES | 03.08.2022 | FI | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | IT | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | MC | 03.08.2022 | MK | 03.08.2022 | NL | 03.08.2022 | PL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | RS | 03.08.2022 | SE | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | IE | 18.08.2022 | LU | 18.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | NO | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 18.08.2017 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
MK | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 18.08.2022 | ||
LU | 18.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 18.08.2017 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 18.08.2022 | ||
LU | 18.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 18.08.2017 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 18.08.2022 | ||
LU | 18.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 18.08.2017 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 18.08.2022 | ||
LU | 18.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 18.08.2022 | ||
LU | 18.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 18.08.2022 | ||
LU | 18.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
IE | 18.08.2022 | ||
LU | 18.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 18.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 18.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 18.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 18.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
LU | 18.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005112404 (HAMADA YUJI [JP], et al); | [I]CN102024909 (UNIV ELECTRONIC SCIENCE & TECH); | International search | [A]CN101222023 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN101728491 (CHANGCHUN APPLIED CHEMISTRY); | [A]CN101916830 (CHANGCHUN APPLIED CHEMISTRY); | [PX]CN106816542 (CHANGCHUN INST APPLIED CHEMISTRY CAS); |