EP3612102 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING AND/OR DETERMINING THE CONCENTRATION OF AN ANALYTE PRESENT IN A TISSUE AND A METHOD AND USE OF THIS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SDS Optic Spolka Akcyjna Ul. Gleboka 39 20-612 Lublin / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | For all designated states SDS Optic Spolka Akcyjna ul. Gleboka 39 20-612 Lublin / PL | ||
Former [2020/09] | For all designated states SDS Optic SP. Z O.O. ul. Konstantynów 1F 20-708 Lublin / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANISZEWSKA, Magdalena Ul. Uniszowice 60K 21-030 Motycz / PL | 02 /
STANISZEWSKI, Marcin Ul. Uniszowice 60K 21-030 Motycz / PL | 03 /
FIDELUS, Janusz Mucharz 41 34-106, Mucharz / PL | 04 /
BUDNICKI, Dawid ul. Firmowa 8 09-540, Sanniki / PL | 05 /
NAPIERALA, Marek ul. Lazurowa 185A/55 01-476, Warszawa / PL | 06 /
WYSOKINSKI, Karol ul. Piolunowa 43 81-589, Gdynia / PL | 07 /
SZOSTKIEWICZ, Lukasz ul. Waska 8a/10 87-100, Torun / PL | 08 /
NASILOWSKI, Tomasz ul. Dzika 15/12 00-172, Warszawa / PL | [2020/20] |
Former [2020/09] | 01 /
STANISZEWSKA, Magdalena ul. Polan 4/1 20-830 Lublin / PL | ||
02 /
STANISZEWSKI, Marcin ul. Polan 4/1 20-830 Lublin / PL | |||
03 /
FIDELUS, Janusz Mucharz 41 34-106, Mucharz / PL | |||
04 /
BUDNICKI, Dawid ul. Firmowa 8 09-540, Sanniki / PL | |||
05 /
NAPIERALA, Marek ul. Lazurowa 185A/55 01-476, Warszawa / PL | |||
06 /
WYSOKINSKI, Karol ul. Piolunowa 43 81-589, Gdynia / PL | |||
07 /
SZOSTKIEWICZ, Lukasz ul. Waska 8a/10 87-100, Torun / PL | |||
08 /
NASILOWSKI, Tomasz ul. Dzika 15/12 00-172, Warszawa / PL | Representative(s) | Kondrat, Mariusz Kondrat & Partners Al. Niepodleglosci 223/1 02-087 Warszawa / PL | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 17891762.1 | 26.05.2017 | [2020/09] | WO2017PL50030 | Priority number, date | PL20170420189 | 14.01.2017 Original published format: PL 42018917 | [2020/09] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018132022 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612102 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3612102 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XV | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/02, A61M5/32, G01N21/17, G01N21/45, G01N33/543, G01N21/77 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
G01N21/45 (EP,US);
A61B5/444 (US);
A61M5/32 (EP,US);
G01N21/77 (US);
G01N2021/458 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7779 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7796 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | A61B10/02, A61M5/32, G01N21/17, G01N21/45, G01N33/543 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM NACHWEIS UND/ODER ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER KONZENTRATION EINES ANALYTEN IN EINEM GEWEBE SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG DIESER VORRICHTUNG | [2020/09] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETECTING AND/OR DETERMINING THE CONCENTRATION OF AN ANALYTE PRESENT IN A TISSUE AND A METHOD AND USE OF THIS DEVICE | [2020/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION ET/OU DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA CONCENTRATION D'UN ANALYTE PRÉSENT DANS UN TISSU ET PROCÉDÉ ET UTILISATION DE CE DISPOSITIF | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 11.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 04.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2020/09] | 14.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 27.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 27.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 17.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 17.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 17.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2019 | Decision despatched | 17.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 14.08.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.10.2022 | AT | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | FI | 19.10.2022 | HR | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | RO | 19.10.2022 | RS | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | IE | 26.05.2023 | LU | 26.05.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
LU | 26.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0042906 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [Y]WO03020119 (BIOLUMINATE INC [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0047] *; | [XYI]US2011136132 (TSENG FAN GANG [TW], et al) [X] 1,5-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0030] * [Y] 2-4 [I] 10; | [A]WO2013067595 (UNIV WESTERN AUSTRALIA [AU]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO2004066824 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-17; | [A]US2004186359 (BEAUDOIN STEPHEN P [US], et al)[A] 1-17; | [A]WO2004102170 (TAN YUSHAN [CN], et al) [A] 1-17; | [A]JP2005249696 (KEIO GIJUKU) [A] 1-17; | [A]CN101032390 (UNIV ZHEJIANG [CN]) [A] 1-17; | [A]US2010063493 (ANASTASIE BRUNO [FR]) [A] 1-17; | [A]US2012116234 (FARCY RENE ALFRED [FR], et al) [A] 1-17; | [A]US2012194661 (LEE BYEONGHA [KR], et al) [A] 1-17; | [A]CN105526883 (UNIV XIAN JIAOTONG ) [A] 1-17 |