EP3572414 - COMPOUND USED AS BRUTON'S TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITOR AND PREPARATION METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chengdu Brilliant Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 15 Gaopeng Avenue Hi-Tech Zone Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | For all designated states Chengdu Highbred Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Room 902 9th Floor Building 12 No.88 Keyuan South Road High-Tech Zone Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yingfu No.15 Gaopeng Avenue High-tech Zone Chengdu Sichuan 610041 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Haoxi No.15 Gaopeng Avenue High-tech Zone Chengdu Sichuan 610041 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Guanfeng No.15 Gaopeng Avenue High-tech Zone Chengdu Sichuan 610041 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Tonghui No.15 Gaopeng Avenue High-tech Zone Chengdu Sichuan 610041 / CN | 05 /
REN, Junfeng No.15 Gaopeng Avenue High-tech Zone Chengdu Sichuan 610041 / CN | 06 /
SU, Zhonghai No.15 Gaopeng Avenue High-tech Zone Chengdu Sichuan 610041 / CN | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 17893058.2 | 20.02.2017 | [2019/48] | WO2017CN74108 | Priority number, date | CN20171044771 | 20.01.2017 Original published format: CN201710044771 | [2019/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018133151 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572414 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D519/00, A61K31/4985, A61K31/5383, A61P29/00, A61P19/02, A61P19/06, A61P19/00, A61P1/18, A61P11/00, A61P11/06, A61P11/02 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | ALS INHIBITOR DER BRUTON-TYROSINKINASE VERWENDETE VERBINDUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/48] | English: | COMPOUND USED AS BRUTON'S TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITOR AND PREPARATION METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2019/48] | French: | COMPOSÉ UTILISÉ COMME INHIBITEUR DE LA TYROSINE KINASE DE BRUTON, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON APPLICATION | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2019 | Translation filed | 21.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 09.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 25.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015181633 (ACERTA PHARMA BV [NL]) [A] 1-15* example - * | International search | [X]WO2013113097 (BETA PHARMA CANADA INC [CA]) [X] 1-18* , description, page 45, compounds 2-3 and 5 *; | [X]WO2015132799 (CADILA HEALTHCARE LTD [IN]) [X] 1-18 * , description, pages 99-100, embodiments 164-168, page 106, embodiments 187-188 and pages 107-108, embodiments 190-192 * | by applicant | WO2011035332 | WO2014140081 | - Tetrahedron Letters, (20160000), vol. 57, pages 599 - 602 | - Journal of Organic Chemistry, (19940000), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 276 - 277 | CN20171044771 |