EP3734350 - LASER BEAM SCANNING DISPLAY DEVICE, AND AUGMENTED REALITY GLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goertek Optical Technology Co., Ltd. NO.1 Fab., Optical Park Phase 3 No. 3999, Huixian Road Yongchun Community Qingchi Sub-district Office, Weifang Hi-Tech Zone Shandong Province / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2023/04] | For all designated states Goertek Optical Technology Co., Ltd. NO.1 Fab., Optical Park Phase 3, No. 3999 Huixian Road Yongchun Community Qingchi Sub-district Office, Weifang Hi-Tech Zone Shandong Province / CN | ||
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states Goertek Technology Co., Ltd. Room 308 Investment Service Center Beizhai Road Laoshan District Qingdao City, Shandong Province 266104 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jin Room 308, Investment Service Center Beizhai Road, Laoshan District Qingdao City Shandong 266104 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Bin Room 308, Investment Service Center Beizhai Road, Laoshan District Qingdao City Shandong 266104 / CN | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | Renaudo, Adrien Hanouar Patendibüroo Käosaar OÜ Tähe 94 50107 Tartu / EE | Application number, filing date | 17893501.1 | 25.12.2017 | [2020/45] | WO2017CN118328 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019126951 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3734350 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.07.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G02B27/10, G02B26/10, G02B26/08 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
G02B26/0833 (EP);
G02B27/0172 (EP,KR,US);
G02B26/10 (KR,US);
G02B27/01 (US);
G02B27/0955 (US);
G02B27/10 (US);
G02B27/18 (KR);
G02B7/04 (US);
G02C11/10 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/45] | G02B27/01, G02B27/10, G02B26/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | LASERSTRAHLABTASTENDE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND BRILLE FÜR ERWEITERTE REALITÄT | [2020/45] | English: | LASER BEAM SCANNING DISPLAY DEVICE, AND AUGMENTED REALITY GLASSES | [2020/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À BALAYAGE PAR FAISCEAU LASER, ET LUNETTES À RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2018 | Translation filed | 30.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2018 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 29.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017285343 (BELENKII MIKHAIL [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * paragraph [0043] *; | [XI]US2017293147 (TREMBLAY ERIC [CH], et al) [X] 1,10 * figures 4A, 7, 10, 13A, 14-16 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 26] , [ 173] , [ 183] , [ 184] * [I] 2-9; | [XI]US2017315360 (TAKEDA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,10 * figure 1 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] - [0 42] * [I] 2-9; | [A] - Anonymous, "Laser projector - Wikipedia", (20171121), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Laser_projector&oldid=811389139, (20210225), XP055779908 [A] 4-7 * sections Modulation, TTL Modulation, Controller DAC & Galvanometer scanners * |