EP3567632 - DISPLAY PANEL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF, AND DISPLAY DEVICE DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Gang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
KO, Kaiyuan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 17894302.3 | 24.01.2017 | [2019/46] | WO2017CN72506 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018137151 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3567632 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L21/77, H01L51/52 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
H10K59/38 (EP,US);
H10K50/865 (US);
H01L21/77 (EP);
H10K59/877 (EP);
H10K59/8791 (EP);
H10K59/8792 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/46] | H01L27/32, H01L21/77 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Title | German: | ANZEIGETAFEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE ANZEIGE FÜR ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/46] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF, AND DISPLAY DEVICE DISPLAY | [2019/46] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2019 | Translation filed | 06.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 04.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007132921 (YOON SANG S [KR]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0008] , [ 0060]; figure 6B *; | [XY]US2008042146 (COK RONALD S [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [ 0018] , [ 0021] , [ 0028] , [ 0030] - [0034] - [ 0116] , [ 0121]; figures 1, 7 * [Y] 2-8; | [A]US2014110690 (YAGI TADAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0097] - [0111]; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]EP2894672 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3-6 * paragraphs [0116] , [ 0121]; figure 12 *; | [A]US2016087247 (KIM WOONG SIK [KR]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0046] - [0053]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2016334553 (WU CHANGYEN [CN], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0048] - [0055]; figure 4 *; | [Y] - Anonyous, "Holography", (20150313), Wikipedia, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Holography, XP002796324 [Y] 2 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN1610471 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP])[A] 1-8; | [A]CN101283308 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-8; | [A]CN104009062 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * [0042]-[0080] 1-5 *; | [A]CN104538427 (BEIJING VISIONOX TECHNOLOGY CO) [A] 1-8; | [A]CN105629544 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-8 |