EP3577471 - ACTIVE MIRRORING CAPACITANCE MONITORING SYSTEM FOR FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L&P Property Management Company 4095 Firestone Boulevard South Gate, CA 90280 / US | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Eric D. 16396 S. Laurelwood Street Olathe, KS 66062 / US | 02 /
BERZIEL, Braden 44 Briarwood Drive Joplin, MO 64804 / US | 03 /
GOPALAKRISHNAN, Vino 112 Zapletal Way Carthage, MO 64836 / US | 04 /
KAUFMANN, Jonathan 327 Pagoda Oak Shavano Park, TX 78230 / US | 05 /
CONYERS, Douglas E. 7118 Bella Rose San Antonio, TX 78256 / US | [2020/16] |
Former [2019/50] | 01 /
MILLER, Eric D. 16396 S. Laurelwood Street Olathe, KS 66062 / US | ||
02 /
BERZIEL, Braden 44 Briarwood Drive Joplin, MO 64804 / US | |||
03 /
GOPALAKRISHNAN, Vino 112 Zapletal Way Carthage, MO 64836 / US | |||
04 /
KAUFMANN, Jonathan 88 Roundup Drive San Antonio, TX 78213 / US | |||
05 /
CONYERS, Douglas E. 7118 Bella Rose San Antonio, TX 78256 / US | Representative(s) | Neusser, Sebastian Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 17895356.8 | 22.12.2017 | [2019/50] | WO2017US68099 | Priority number, date | US201715422472 | 02.02.2017 Original published format: US201715422472 | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144162 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3577471 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/24 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
G01D5/24 (EP,US);
G06F1/00 (US);
H03B1/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | G01R27/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | AKTIVES SPIEGELKAPAZITÄTSÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR MÖBEL | [2019/50] | English: | ACTIVE MIRRORING CAPACITANCE MONITORING SYSTEM FOR FURNITURE | [2019/50] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE CAPACITÉ À EFFET MIROIR ACTIF POUR MEUBLES | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 27.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/48] | 12.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009007500 (UPM KYMMENE CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 3,4,15 ** pages 22,29,36; figure 7a *; | [A]US2009160461 (ZANGL HUBERT [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0044]; claims 14-22 * | International search | [A]US2005122119 (BARLOW GEORGE H [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2015137835 (CHACON RYAN EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2015206598 (ENJALBERT JEROME [FR]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2016084487 (CHACON RYAN EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document, especially; abstract, para. [0007], [0036], [0076], [0148], [0151] *; | [A]US2016128628 (CHEN YU-HAN [TW]) [A] 1-20* , entire document * |