EP3583250 - METHOD AND SYSTEMS FOR THE EFFICIENT COMPRESSION OF GENOMIC SEQUENCE READS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genomsys SA Fondation EPFL Innovation Park Batiment C 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2023/28] |
Former [2019/52] | For all designated states Genomsys SA Fondation EPFL Innovation Park Batiment C 1015 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALUCH, Mohamed, Khoso 4439 Woodsedge Court Chantilly, VA 20151 / US | 02 /
ALBERTI, Claudio 1 Chemin des Esserts 1213 Petit-Lancy (Geneva) / CH | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Metroconsult Srl Foro Bonaparte 51 20121 Milano / IT | [2023/28] |
Former [2019/52] | De Anna, Pier Luigi DEANNA-PATENT c/o Meissner Bolte Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17896462.3 | 15.12.2017 | [2019/52] | WO2017US66863 | Priority number, date | WO2017US17842 | 14.02.2017 Original published format: PCT/US2017/017842 | WO2017US41579 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: PCT/US2017/041579 | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018151788 | Date: | 23.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3583250 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3583250 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16B50/50, G16B30/20, G06F21/62, H03M7/30 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H03M7/3086 (EP,EA,US);
G16B50/30 (EA,KR);
G06F21/12 (EA,KR);
G16B30/20 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6809 (US);
G06F21/6245 (EP,EA,US);
G16B30/00 (EA);
G16B30/10 (US);
G16B40/10 (US);
G16B45/00 (EA,KR);
G16B50/00 (EA);
G16B50/20 (US);
G16B50/50 (EP);
H03M7/30 (EA);
H03M7/3088 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/51] | G16B50/50, G16B30/20 | ||
Former IPC [2019/52] | C40B50/02, G06F19/26, G06F19/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR EFFIZIENTEN KOMPRIMIERUNG GENOMISCHER SEQUENZAUSLESUNGEN | [2019/52] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEMS FOR THE EFFICIENT COMPRESSION OF GENOMIC SEQUENCE READS | [2019/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈMES POUR LA COMPRESSION EFFICACE DE LECTURES DE SÉQUENCE GÉNOMIQUE | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.08.2019 | Observations by third parties | 30.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 02.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 20.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 20.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.12.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SI | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
GR | 13.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015227686 (SHEININ VADIM [US], et al) [A] 1-38* claims 1, 7, [0038]-[0044] *; | [XI] - Anonymous, "CRAM format specification (version 3.0)", (20160908), URL: https://samtools.github.io/hts-specs/CRAMv3.pdf, (20170622), XP002771305 [X] 1,19,34,35,37 * Sect. 5, 7, 12; pgs. 13, 18ff. * [I] 1-38 | International search | [A]US2016100177 (PU WEI [US], et al) [A] 14-18, 20, 24* abstract *; | [Y] - PARIDAENS et al., "AFRESh: an adaptive framework for compression of reads and assembled sequences with random access functionality", Bioinformatics, (20170105), vol. 33, no. 10, pages 1464 - 1472, XP055537212 [Y] 1-13, 19, 21-23, 25-33, 45-63, 76-82 * , pg 1465, col 1, para 1-3, col 2, para 2, para 4-6, pg 1466 col 1 para 1, 4-5, col 2, para 4, pg 1467, col 1, para 1-2, 4-6, pg 1468, col 2, para 5-6, Fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/btx001 | [Y] - PENG et al., "Re-alignment of the unmapped reads with base quality score", BMC Bioinformatics, (20150318), vol. 16, no. Suppl 5, page S8, XP021217805 [Y] 1-13, 19, 21-23, 25-33, 45-63, 76-82 * , abstract, pg 5, col 2, para 1, * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-16-S5-S8 | [Y] - "Java CIGAR Parser for SAM format", Bioinformatics I/O, (20151116), URL: http://bioinformatics.cvr.ac.uk/blog/tag/cigar-string, (20180619), XP055537219 [Y] 3-13, 19, 21-23, 25-33, 46-63, 77, 78, 80 * entire document * | [YA] - DAILY et al., "Data structures and compression algorithms for high-throughput sequencing technologies", BMC Bioinformatics, (20101014), vol. 11, page 514, XP021071841 [Y] 4-13, 19, 21-23, 25-33, 47-63, 77, 78, 80 * , abstract, pg 2, col 1, para 2, pg 3, col 1, para 4 pg 5, col 1, para 5, pg 8, col 1, para 2- * [A] 14-18, 20, 24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-11-514 | [YA] - PANNEEL, "Implementation and optimization of CABAC in a genomic data compression framework with support for random access", Master's dissertation, Faculty of Engineering and Architecture,, (20150800), XP055535469 [Y] 19, 21-23 * , pg 5, para 3, pg 25, para 1, Table 5.3 * [A] 14-18, 20, 24 | by applicant | - CRAM format specification (version 3.0, (20160908), URL: https://samtools.qithub.io/hts-specs/CRAMv3.pdf |