EP3586807 - MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIZUHO Corporation 30-13, Hongo 3-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Akihisa c/o Mizuho Corporation Chiba Works 2173-13 Ohta Sakura-shi Chiba 285-0808 / JP | 02 /
NAKAKUKI, Tomoya c/o Mizuho Corporation Chiba Works 2173-13 Ohta Sakura-shi Chiba 285-0808 / JP | 03 /
OBI, Takuya c/o Mizuho Corporation Chiba Works 2173-13 Ohta Sakura-shi Chiba 285-0808 / JP | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 17897961.3 | 27.02.2017 | [2020/01] | WO2017JP07334 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018154750 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586807 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3586807 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61G13/10, A61G7/05, G01G19/52, A61G13/02 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
A61G13/02 (EP);
A61G13/10 (US);
A61G13/08 (US);
A61G13/104 (EP);
B60B33/0089 (EP,US);
G01G19/52 (EP,US);
A47B2220/003 (US);
A47B91/02 (US);
A61G2203/16 (US);
A61G2203/44 (US);
B60B2200/22 (US);
B60B2200/242 (EP);
B60B33/06 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | A61G13/10, A61G7/05, G01G19/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/01] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE | [2020/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2019 | Translation filed | 27.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 20.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS505665U (ILLEGIBLE) [X] 1-4 * figures 1, 2 * [I] 5; | [X]WO9107158 (FULMER SYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5* page 7, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [XA]DE9113089U (EISENMÖBELFABRIK) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 12 - page 4, line 28; figures 1-4 * [A] 3-5; | [XAI]US5747745 (NEUMAN ELI [IL]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 41 - column 4, line 58; figures 1-13 * [A] 4 [I] 5; | [T]JP2017046966 (MIZUHO CORP) [T] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [XYA]JPS5322361Y (Sanyo Electric Works, Ltd.) [X] 1-2 * , column 2, line 10 to column 4, line 1; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) * [Y] 5 [A] 3-4; | [XYA]JP3081361U (Ganburo Kabushiki Kaisha) [X] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0017]; fig. 4 (Family: none) * [Y] 5 [A] 3-4; | [Y]JP2009034501 (TRUMPF MEDIZIN SYSTEME GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 5* , paragraphs [0007], [0034]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 2009/0031497 A1 paragraphs [0008], [0040]; fig. 1 to 2 & EP 2020217 A1 & EP 2020218 A1 & DE 502007007063 D & CN 101357096 A *; | [XYA]JP2013148520 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0025] to [0042], [0046]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) * [Y] 5 [A] 3-4 | by applicant | JP2004073616 |