EP3590736 - STUD PIN AND STUDDED TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa Prefecture, 254-8601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/46] | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa Prefecture, 254-8601 / JP | ||
Former [2020/02] | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Masakazu c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co. Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1 Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2020/02] | Application number, filing date | 17898547.9 | 28.02.2017 | [2020/02] | WO2017JP07672 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018158799 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3590736 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3590736 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/16 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
B60C11/1643 (EP,US);
B60C11/1675 (US);
B60C11/16 (RU);
B60C11/1656 (US);
B60C11/1668 (US);
B60C11/1687 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIKESTIFT UND BESPIKTER REIFEN | [2020/02] | English: | STUD PIN AND STUDDED TIRE | [2020/02] | French: | CLOU ANTIDÉRAPANT ET PNEU CLOUTÉ | [2020/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2019 | Translation filed | 24.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 19.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | ES | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | IT | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | IE | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | LU | 28.02.2023 | FR | 04.03.2023 | GB | 04.04.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
IE | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
LU | 28.02.2023 | ||
FR | 04.03.2023 | ||
GB | 04.04.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
IE | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
LU | 28.02.2023 | ||
GB | 04.04.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
LU | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
LU | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101269613 (NOKIAN RENKAAT OYJ [FI]) [A] 1-8* figures 1-3,6 *; | [A]WO2014027146 (SCASON OY [FI]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US2013000807 (PONS FREDERIC MICHEL-JEAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]KR20150071293 (HANKOOK TIRE CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8* , *; | [A]JP2015136942 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]WO2015139860 (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]WO2016098394 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , * | Examination | FI20145032 | RU2015101146 | by applicant | WO2014027145 |