EP3582537 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/51] | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE | ||
[2021/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2019/51] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Hai No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 17899174.1 | 28.02.2017 | [2019/51] | WO2017CN75243 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018157297 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3582537 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3582537 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, // H04W88/02 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
H04B7/0456 (EP,IL);
H04W24/10 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
H04B7/0626 (IL,KR);
H04B7/0647 (EP,IL);
H04L5/003 (IL,US);
H04L5/0037 (EP,IL,US);
H04L5/0057 (EP,IL,US);
H04W88/02 (CN,IL,RU);
H04W88/08 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/01] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2021/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2021/01] |
Former [2019/51] | DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2019/51] | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE | ||
Former [2019/51] | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2019 | Translation filed | 13.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 02.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21171745.9 / EP3883289 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2017 | AL | 09.06.2021 | AT | 09.06.2021 | CY | 09.06.2021 | CZ | 09.06.2021 | DK | 09.06.2021 | EE | 09.06.2021 | FI | 09.06.2021 | HR | 09.06.2021 | LT | 09.06.2021 | LV | 09.06.2021 | MC | 09.06.2021 | MK | 09.06.2021 | MT | 09.06.2021 | PL | 09.06.2021 | RO | 09.06.2021 | RS | 09.06.2021 | SE | 09.06.2021 | SI | 09.06.2021 | SK | 09.06.2021 | SM | 09.06.2021 | BG | 09.09.2021 | NO | 09.09.2021 | GR | 10.09.2021 | IS | 09.10.2021 | PT | 11.10.2021 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | IE | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | LU | 28.02.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 28.02.2017 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
MK | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
MK | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]CN102624494 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-4,6-9,13-22,26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0 19] , [0 21] , [0 30] , [0 33] , [0 65] , [ 115] * [Y] 1-26 [I] 5,10-12,18,23-25; | [A]EP2582075 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 7] , [0 17] , [0 67] - [0071] *; | [Y]EP2919506 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraphs 28, 33-34, 42, 48, 50-56, 60, 64, 69, 80-81, 101-104, 126;; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP3125456 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-26 * abstract ** paragraphs [0010] , [ 161] - [0163] - [ 174] , [ 282]; claim 1 *; | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "Discussion on Activation/Deactivation CSI-RS MAC CE for eFD-MIMO", vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1701829 DISCUSSION ON ACTIVATION DEACTIVATION CSI-RS MAC CE FOR EFD-MIMO, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170212), XP051212393 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP2475127 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-46* , entire document *; | [X]CN102624494 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-46 * , description, paragraphs [0002] and [0046]-[0133], and figures 3-9 *; | [X]CN102740447 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-46 * , description, paragraphs [0080]-[0081], and figure 6 *; | [X]CN103546207 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-46 * , description, paragraphs [0045]-[0155], and figures 2-6 *; | [X]WO2014019168 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-46 * , description, page 11, line 20 to page 27, line 17, and figures 1-13 * |