EP3598012 - CONTROL METHOD FOR AIR DEFLECTORS OF AIR CONDITIONER AND AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xinliang West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Hui West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 03 /
YU, Kai West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Qunbo West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 05 /
XUE, Handong West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | 06 /
CHEN, Ganbin West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | Nevett, Duncan Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17900855.2 | 18.10.2017 | [2020/04] | WO2017CN106673 | Priority number, date | CN201710156104 | 16.03.2017 Original published format: CN201710156104 | [2020/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018166200 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598012 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3598012 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00, F24F13/15, F24F13/10, F24F13/14, F24F11/62 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
F24F11/62 (EP,CN);
F24F11/79 (CN,KR,US);
F24F11/30 (CN,KR);
F24F11/63 (KR);
F24F13/06 (US);
F24F13/10 (EP);
F24F13/14 (EP);
F24F13/1413 (EP);
F24F13/1426 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/04] | F24F11/00, F24F13/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR LUFTDEFLEKTOREN EINER KLIMAANLAGE SOWIE KLIMAANLAGE | [2020/04] | English: | CONTROL METHOD FOR AIR DEFLECTORS OF AIR CONDITIONER AND AIR CONDITIONER | [2020/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DÉFLECTEURS D'AIR DE CLIMATISEUR ET CLIMATISEUR ASSOCIÉ | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2019 | Translation filed | 30.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 30.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2008122004 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [I] 1,3,5,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4,6,9,10; | [Y]JP2009257606 (SHARP KK) [Y] 2,4,6,9 * paragraphs [0027] - [0043] - [0059] - [0070]; figures 1-16 *; | [I]WO2011021338 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1,5* paragraphs [0030] - [0045]; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]CN202692366U (ZHUHAI GREE ELEC APPLIANCES) [Y] 4,9,10 * paragraphs [0041] - [0050]; figures 1,2 * |