EP3527689 - AL2O3 SPUTTERING TARGET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 1-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8164 / JP | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOIDO Yoshimasa c/o Isohara Factory of JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 187-4 Usuba Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi Ibaraki 319-1535 / JP | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Cornford, James Robert Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 17901157.2 | 06.12.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017JP43730 | Priority number, date | JP20170049874 | 15.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017049874 | [2019/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018168111 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3527689 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/34, C04B35/111 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
C04B35/111 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/3414 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/081 (EP);
C23C14/542 (US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP);
C04B2235/604 (EP);
C04B2235/608 (EP);
C04B2235/668 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/72 (EP);
C04B2235/77 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/785 (EP);
C04B2235/786 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AL2O3-SPUTTERTARGET UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/34] | English: | AL2O3 SPUTTERING TARGET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2019/34] | French: | CIBLE DE PULVÉRISATION D'AL2O3 ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2019 | Translation filed | 24.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 09.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10298743 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 10-14* , claim 1 & US 6074279 A1, claim 1 & TW 381123 B *; | [A]WO2013065337 (FERROTEC CERAMICS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * , claims 1, 14, paragraph [0039] & US 2015/0122642 A1, claims 1, 7, paragraph [0038] & CN 103917688 A & KR 10-2014-0073570 A & TW 201319286 A * |