EP3595367 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING INDICATION INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JI, Tong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
JIN, Zhe Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Weiliang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
TIE, Xiaolei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 17901371.9 | 24.03.2017 | [2020/03] | WO2017CN78113 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018170896 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3595367 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
H04W52/0235 (EP,US);
H04W52/0229 (CN);
H04W72/1273 (US);
H04W68/005 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/0466 (US);
H04W72/23 (CN,US);
H04W74/0808 (US);
H04W76/11 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON INDIKATIONSINFORMATIONEN | [2020/03] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING INDICATION INFORMATION | [2020/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSMETTRE DES INFORMATIONS D'INDICATION | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2019 | Translation filed | 07.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 07.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 27.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012213137 (JEONG KYEONGIN [KR], et al); | International search | [X]CN101483446 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1-31 * , description, page 1, line 13 to page 6, line 9, and figures 3-5 *; | [X]CN101583178 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM [CN]) [X] 1-31 * , description, page 1, line 14 to page 12, line 24, and figure 5 *; | [A]WO2011160799 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-31* , entire document *; | [X] - 3GPP, "Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall description; Stage 2 (Release 8)", 3GPP TS 36.300 V8.2.0, (20070930), pages 1 - 109, XP055539681 [X] 1-31 * , section 12 * |