EP3591570 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING TERMINAL HELD BY SUBJECT IN PICTURE AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xuenan c/o Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP MTH The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 17901655.5 | 14.07.2017 | [2020/02] | WO2017CN92944 | Priority number, date | CN201710175226 | 22.03.2017 Original published format: CN201710175226 | [2020/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018171090 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3591570 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, H04M1/725, H04N5/232 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
H04M1/72412 (EP);
G06V20/20 (US);
G06F16/55 (US);
G06F16/583 (US);
G06F16/5866 (US);
G06V40/16 (EP);
G06V40/172 (US);
H04L51/214 (US);
H04M1/72439 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/02] | G06K9/00, G06F17/30, H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES VON EINER PERSON GEHALTENEN ENDGERÄTS AUF EINEM BILD UND ENDGERÄT | [2020/02] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING TERMINAL HELD BY SUBJECT IN PICTURE AND TERMINAL | [2020/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UN TERMINAL TENU PAR UN SUJET DANS UNE IMAGE, ET TERMINAL | [2020/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2019 | Translation filed | 02.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 18.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/16] | 18.12.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013136316 (GRASSEL GUIDO PETER [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-12 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,8,9; | [A]US2015142891 (HAQUE SHAFKAT UL [US], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]CN105740426 (YULONG COMPUTER TELECOMMUNICATION SCIENTIFIC SHENZHEN CO LTD ) [X] 1,2,5-8,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A] - TOMOYA ONISHI ET AL, "Personal photo browser that can classify photos by participants and situations", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL WORKING CONFERENCE ON ADVANCED VISUAL INTERFACES, AVI '12, New York, New York, USA, (20120101), doi:10.1145/2254556.2254720, ISBN 978-1-4503-1287-5, page 798, XP055664579 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2254556.2254720 | International search | [A]CN103235814 (SHANGHAI FREECOMM DATA COMM CO) [A] 1-12; | [A]US8655028 (HSI CHEN-NING [TW])[A] 1-12; | [A]CN104317932 (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO) [A] 1-12; | [A]CN105025162 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD) [A] 1-12; | [A]CN105119971 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-12; | [X]CN105740426 (YULONG COMPUTER TELECOMMUNICATION SCIENTIFIC SHENZHEN CO LTD ) [X] 1, 2, 5-7, 10-12; | [X]CN105897564 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1, 2, 5-7, 10-12; | [X]CN106034179 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1, 2, 5-7, 10-12; | [A]CN106326820 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-12; | [PX]CN106534481 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1, 2, 5-7, 10-12 |