EP3586324 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR FIRE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Dahua Technology Co., Ltd No.1187 BinAn Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310053 / CN | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Jia No.1187 Binan Road Binjiang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310053 / CN | 02 /
TIAN, Jianguo No.1187 Binan Road Binjiang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310053 / CN | 03 /
PAN, Huadong No.1187 Binan Road Binjiang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310053 / CN | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Wang, Bo Panovision IP Ebersberger Straße 3 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 17902660.4 | 27.05.2017 | [2020/01] | WO2017CN86315 | Priority number, date | CN201710193196 | 28.03.2017 Original published format: CN201710193196 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018176624 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586324 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/00, G06K9/00 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
G08B17/125 (EP,US);
G06V20/52 (EP,CN,US);
G06F18/2433 (EP);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V20/188 (US);
G06V20/20 (US);
G06V20/47 (CN);
G08B25/08 (EP);
G06V20/194 (US);
G08B17/005 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | G08B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR OBJEKTDETEKTION | [2020/01] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR FIRE DETECTION | [2020/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE DÉTECTION D'INCENDIE | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 19.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]CN101872526 (CHONGQING HELPSOFT IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * [A] 3-10,12-15; | [XA]CN101587622B (LI QIUHUA, et al) [X] 1-3,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016] * [A] 4-10,12-15; | [A] - TASDEMIR K ET AL, "Video based fire detection at night", SIGNAL PROCESSING AND COMMUNICATIONS APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2009. SIU 2009. IEEE 17TH, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090409), ISBN 978-1-4244-4435-9, pages 720 - 723, XP031480637 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR100638120B (YOUNG KOOK ELECTRONICS [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]CN102663869 (NAT ENGINEERING RES CT FOR FIRE PROT, et al) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 25 to 77 and figure 2 *; | [A]KR101309407B (SHIN HYUN KI [KR]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]CN103778418 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH, et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103956016 (BENGBU EI FIRE ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]CN106408846 (ZHOU CHUAN) [X] 1-20 * description, abstract and figure 2 * |