EP3588675 - ANTENNA, AND TERMINAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2021/27] |
Former [2020/01] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Dawei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Shichao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
XIE, Wanbo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Hanyang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 17903182.8 | 29.03.2017 | [2020/01] | WO2017CN78623 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018176279 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3588675 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3588675 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q5/328, H01Q5/378 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q5/10 (KR,US);
H01Q1/44 (KR);
H01Q1/48 (KR);
H01Q5/328 (EP);
H01Q5/378 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | H01Q1/44, H01Q1/24, H01Q5/328, H01Q5/378 | ||
Former IPC [2020/01] | H01Q1/44, H01Q5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNE UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/01] | English: | ANTENNA, AND TERMINAL APPARATUS | [2020/01] | French: | ANTENNE ET APPAREIL TERMINAL | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2019 | Translation filed | 26.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 06.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.04.2023 | CZ | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | ES | 19.04.2023 | FI | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | IT | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | PL | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | RS | 19.04.2023 | SE | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SK | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | NO | 19.07.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | PT | 21.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 19.04.2023 | |
PT | 21.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015171916 (ASRANI VIJAY L [US], et al) [X] 1,4,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0059] * [I] 2,3,5-10; | [XI]US2015318601 (LIN YEN-HUI [TW]) [X] 1-3,5,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] *[I] 4,6-9; | [XI]WO2016103859 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * abstract * [I] 3-9 | International search | [Y]CN103633426 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * , description, paragraphs [0030], [0033], [0041] and [0042], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [A]CN104584322 (NOKIA CORP) [A] 1-11 * , entire document *; | [Y]CN105305067 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * , description, paragraphs [0029]-[0043], and figures 2 and 3 *; | [Y]CN105789881 (BYD CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * , description, paragraphs [0042]-[0052], and figures 3 and 4 *; | [A]CN105789831 (SHENZHEN ONEPLUS TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , entire document *; | [A]US9413058 (KUO JERRY WEIMING [US], et al) [A] 1-11* , entire document * | Examination | US2014266922 |