EP3532550 - INKJET INK(S) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABELOVSKI, Benjamin 16399 W Bernardo Dr. San Diego, California 92127 / US | 02 /
VU, Ryan 16399 W Bernardo Dr. San Diego, California 92127 / US | 03 /
ZHENG, Jie 16399 W Bernardo Dr. San Diego, California 92127 / US | 04 /
GUO, Dennis 16399 W Bernardo Dr. San Diego, California 92127 / US | 05 /
SARKISIAN, George 16399 W Bernardo Dr. San Diego, California 92127 / US | 06 /
CHEN, Tienteh 16399 W Bernardo Dr. San Diego, California 92127 / US | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/36] | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17903980.5 | 27.03.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017US24337 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018182568 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3532550 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/30, C09D11/328, C09D11/102, C09D11/40, C09D175/04, C09D175/14, C08G18/28, C08G18/32, C08G18/67 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
C09D11/40 (EP,US);
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C08G18/0828 (EP,US);
C08G18/2081 (EP);
C08G18/227 (EP);
C08G18/246 (EP);
C08G18/3206 (US);
C08G18/348 (EP,US);
C08G18/3857 (EP);
C08G18/4063 (EP);
C08G18/4255 (US);
C08G18/4825 (EP);
C08G18/6245 (EP);
C08G18/6685 (EP);
C08G18/755 (EP,US);
C08G71/04 (US);
C08L75/04 (US);
C09D11/102 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L75/04, C08L23/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLTINTE(N) | [2019/36] | English: | INKJET INK(S) | [2019/36] | French: | ENCRE(S) POUR JET D'ENCRE | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 11.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/01] | 31.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008207820 (BRUST THOMAS B [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0109]; example 1 * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071] *; | [X]US2013237661 (BRUST THOMAS B [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * * paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0088] *; | [A]WO2016122563 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [E]WO2018156157 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document * * paragraph [0121]; tables 2,3,4 * * paragraph [0117]; claim 14 * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0091] * | International search | [XY]WO2012105949 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [X] 1, 3-5, 12-14 * , p.1, lines 5-6, p.2, lines 13-28 - p.3, lines 1-2, p.4, lines 10-20, 23-27, p.5, line 24, p.7, lines 17-19, p.8, lines 1-9, 20-23 - p.9, lines 1-16 * [Y] 2, 6-11, 15; | [Y]WO2016122569 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [Y] 2, 6-11, 15* , paragraphs [005], [0012], [0013], [0033], [0036], [0038],[0039], [0040], [0042], [0043], [0048], [0054]-[0056], [0093]. Table 1 * |