EP3595354 - TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR CONTROL CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/03] | TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR CONTROL CHANNEL AND RELATED DEVICE | ||
[2020/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Da Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/03] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP MTH The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 17904496.1 | 16.06.2017 | [2020/03] | WO2017CN88790 | Priority number, date | CN201710225316 | 07.04.2017 Original published format: CN201710225316 | [2020/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018184295 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3595354 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3595354 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/00, H04L5/00 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04B1/69 (US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W28/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | H04W28/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR STEUERKANAL | [2020/44] | English: | TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR CONTROL CHANNEL | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION POUR CANAL DE COMMANDE | [2020/44] |
Former [2020/03] | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR STEUERKANAL UND DIESBEZÜGLICHE VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2020/03] | TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR CONTROL CHANNEL AND RELATED DEVICE | ||
Former [2020/03] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION POUR CANAL DE COMMANDE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2019 | Translation filed | 10.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 19.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2017 | AL | 24.02.2021 | AT | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | CZ | 24.02.2021 | DK | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | ES | 24.02.2021 | FI | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | IT | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | MK | 24.02.2021 | MT | 24.02.2021 | NL | 24.02.2021 | PL | 24.02.2021 | RO | 24.02.2021 | RS | 24.02.2021 | SE | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SK | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | TR | 24.02.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | NO | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | IE | 16.06.2021 | LU | 16.06.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | PT | 24.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | FR | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.06.2017 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
MK | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
TR | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IE | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 16.06.2017 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
MK | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IE | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 16.06.2017 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IE | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IE | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IE | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IE | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IE | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 16.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015282158 (CHEN WANSHI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] - [0064] ** figure 8 *; | [X]WO2017026814 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | US2020029325 [ ] (HWANG DAESUNG [KR], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0065] - [0067] - [0074] , [0083] , [0155] , [0157] , [0170] - [0178] * * figures 1,5,11 * | International search | [A]CN104641577 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-30; | [A]CN105594286 (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1-30; | [X]CN106105088 (QUALCOMM INC) [X] 1-30; | [A] - HUAWEI et al., "New PUCCH format design to support UCI transmission for up to 32 component carriers", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #82, Rl-153770, (20150828), vol. RAN WG1, XP051001216 [A] 1-30 * , * |