EP3453731 - METHOD FOR SYNTHESIZING PBAT-PLA COPOLYESTER BY MEANS OF COPOLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henan Green polymer co., Ltd Bin Mao southwest of Changyi Road and Futan Road Nanle County industrial district, Puyang Henan 457400 / CN | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUAN, Liuwen Room 503 Building 5 Sunshine Garden Ru Cheng Town Rugao Jiangsu 226500 / CN | 02 /
LI, Wanxin Room 305 Building 6 No.50 Kaifang middle Road, Tinghu district Yancheng Jiangsu 226500 / CN | 03 /
TANG, Yongbin Room 201 Building 20 Xinghu Garden Development zone Nantong Jiangsu 226000 / CN | 04 /
HE, Xinyu Room 508 Building 6 Guangming New village Chongchuan District Nantong Jiangsu 226000 / CN | 05 /
YANG, Wenjun No.45 Group eight Yongfu village Changjiang Town Rugao Jiangsu 226500 / CN | 06 /
MAO, Bin Room 606 Building 165 Yi Jia Qiao New Village Chongchuan District Nantong Jiangsu 226000 / CN | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 17905898.7 | 29.08.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017CN99437 | Priority number, date | CN201710559728 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710559728 | [2019/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019010767 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453731 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3453731 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/60, C08G63/78, C08G63/183, C08G63/08 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
C08G81/00 (EP);
C08G63/60 (EP,CN,US);
C08G63/08 (CN,US);
C08G63/183 (CN,US);
C08G63/78 (EP,CN);
C08G63/823 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON PBAT-PLA-COPOLYESTER DURCH COPOLYMERISIERUNG | [2019/11] | English: | METHOD FOR SYNTHESIZING PBAT-PLA COPOLYESTER BY MEANS OF COPOLYMERIZATION | [2019/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE DE COPOLYESTER PBAT-PLA PAR COPOLYMÉRISATION | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2018 | Translation filed | 22.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 30.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2017 | AL | 06.11.2019 | AT | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | ES | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SE | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | NO | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.08.2017 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 06.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN103819884 (SHANGHAI ZAIHE IND INVEST CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * melt extrsusion of PLA/PBAT and PBAT pre-polymer (degree of polymerisation 50-5000);; example embodiment 11 * * abstract *; | [A] - MARIA-BEATRICE COLTELLI ET AL, "Compatible blends of biorelated polyesters through catalytic transesterification in the melt", POLYMER DEGRADATION AND STABILITY, GB, (20110321), vol. 96, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.polymdegradstab.2011.01.028, ISSN 0141-3910, pages 982 - 990, XP055531954 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymdegradstab.2011.01.028 | [A] - P. MA ET AL, "In-situ compatibilization of poly(lactic acid) and poly(butylene adipate-co-terephthalate) blends by using dicumyl peroxide as a free-radical initiator", POLYMER DEGRADATION AND STABILITY, GB, (20140401), vol. 102, doi:10.1016/j.polymdegradstab.2014.01.025, ISSN 0141-3910, pages 145 - 151, XP055531951 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymdegradstab.2014.01.025 | International search | [A]JPH10287735 (KANEBO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , see entire document *; | [A]CN102838734 (CHANGCHUN APPLIED CHEMISTRY) [A] 1-10 * , see description, paragraphs [0007]-[0025] *; | [A]WO2013073819 (SK CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10* , see entire document *; | [A]CN103589124 (SHANGHAI GENIUS ADVANCED MAT) [A] 1-10 * , see entire document *; | [A]CN103788346 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al) [A] 1-10 * , see description, paragraphs [0004]-[0008] *; | [A]KR20140075468 (SAMSUNG FINE CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * , see entire document *; | [A]CN105440267 (CHANGCHUN INST APPLIED CHEMISTRY CAS) [A] 1-10 * , see entire document *; | [A]CN105524262 (CHANGCHUN INST APPLIED CHEMISTRY CAS) [A] 1-10 * , see entire document * |