EP3514040 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR ELECTRIC POWER STEERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3 Osaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAGUCHI, Toru c/o NSK LTD. 78 Toriba-Machi Maebashi-Shi Gunma 371-8527 / JP | 02 /
KITAZUME, Tetsuya c/o NSK LTD. 78 Toriba-Machi Maebashi-Shi Gunma 371-8527 / JP | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Luten, Martin Haaije, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 17905901.9 | 22.11.2017 | [2019/30] | WO2017JP42014 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019102543 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3514040 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D6/00, B62D5/04, B62D101/00, B62D113/00, B62D117/00 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
B62D5/0469 (EP,US);
B62D15/0235 (US);
B62D3/12 (US);
B62D5/0463 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTRISCHE SERVOLENKVORRICHTUNG | [2019/30] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR ELECTRIC POWER STEERING DEVICE | [2019/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION À ASSISTANCE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2019/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2018 | Translation filed | 22.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 07.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/12] | 28.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017327145 (SAKAGUCHI TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15,17-19 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0204] - paragraph [0224]; figures 1-50 *; | [A]WO2017159843 (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15,17-19 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0114]; figures 1-49 * | International search | [Y]JP2017171062 (NSK LTD) [Y] 1-19 * , claims 6, 8, fig. 3-37 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2017165306 (NSK LTD) [Y] 1-19 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0031], [0032], fig. 3-20 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2016104571 (NSK LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-19 * , claims 5, 6, fig. 3-50 & US 2017/0334481 A1, claims 45, 56, fig. 3-54 & WO 2016/104568 A1 & WO 2016/104569 A1 & WO 2016/104570 A1 & WO 2016/104568 A1 & EP 3222497 A1 *; | [Y]JP2003529480 (DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.) [Y] 1-19 * , paragraph [0009], fig. 3, 7 & US 6408235 B1, column 3, lines 48-51, column 4, lines 13-17, fig. 3, 7 & WO 2001/020412 A1 *; | [A]JP2008284889 (NSK LTD) [A] 1-19 * , paragraph [0102], fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [EX]JP2017210216 (NSK LTD) [EX] 1-19 * , claims 1-19, fig. 3-54 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH064417B | JP4115156B | - "Elementary Mechanics for Elastic Membrane and Viscoelasticity", KENKICHI OHBA, Engineering Sciences & Technology, Kansai University | - official journal of a scientific society, (20100000), vol. 17 | - HAJIME MAEDA; TOSHIHARU SUGIE, System Control Theory for Advanced Control, Asakura Shoten |