EP3621230 - USER TERMINAL, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEDA, Kazuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
WANG, Lihui c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co. Ltd. 7/F Raycom Infotech Park Tower A No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 04 /
HOU, Xiaolin c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co. Ltd. 7/F Raycom Infotech Park Tower A No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 17908108.8 | 02.05.2017 | [2020/11] | WO2017JP17305 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018203406 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3621230 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/16, H04L1/18 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (US);
H04L1/18 (RU);
H04L1/1822 (EP,US);
H04L1/1887 (US);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04W28/04 (RU);
H04W72/23 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/11] | H04L1/18, H04W28/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Title | German: | BENUTZERENDGERÄT UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2020/11] | English: | USER TERMINAL, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2020/11] | French: | TERMINAL D'UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2020/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2019 | Translation filed | 18.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 17.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2024 | 22.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.12.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3609226 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [E] 1,6 * paragraphs [0037] - [0050] - [0118] - [0136] ** figures 4,5,10 *; | [X] - SAMSUNG, "CB-group based retransmission for eMBB", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1702990 - CBG-BASED RETRANSMISSION FOR EMBB, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051210132 [X] 1-6 * sections 2.1, 2.3 * | [XI] - CATT, "Discussion on NR HARQ-ACK feedback mechanisms", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170403 - 20170407, (20170402), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1704583, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170402), XP051242722 [X] 1,3,5,6 * section 2 * [I] 1-6 | International search | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "Overview of CBG-based retransmission in NR", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1#88bis R1-1705401, (20170324), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_88b/Docs/R1-1705401.zip, XP051250686 [Y] 1-6 | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "CB-group based retransmission for eMBB", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1#88 R1-1702990, (20170200), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg-ran/WG1-RL1/TSGR1-88/Docs/R1-1702990.zip, XP051221790 [Y] 1-6 | [Y] - NTT DOCOMO,INC., "On DL dynamic multiplexing of eMBB and URLLC", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1#88bis R1-1705753, (20170325), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_88b/Docs/R1-1705753.zip, XP051252168 [Y] 3-5 | [Y] - HUAWEI, HISILICON, "Discussion on CBG-based feedback and retransmission", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1#88bis R1-1705066, (20170325), pages 1 - 4, URL: www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_88b/Docs/R1-1705066.zip, XP051251724 [Y] 4, 5 |