EP3554010 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USE IN CONSTRUCTING CONTENT DELIVERY NETWORK PLATFORM ON HETEROGENEOUS RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wangsu Science & Technology Co., Ltd. Building A Floor 5 Guangqi Culture Plaza 2899 Xietu Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200030 / CN | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIAN, Lingxiang Building A Floor 5 Guangqi Culture Plaza No. 2899 Xietu Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200030 / CN | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | de Arpe Fernandez, Manuel, et al Arpe Patentes y Marcas Edificio Aqua, Calle Agustín de Foxá 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | de Arpe Fernandez, Manuel, et al Arpe Patentes y Marcas Alcalá, 26, 5ª Planta 28014 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2019/42] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 17909038.6 | 01.06.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017CN86770 | Priority number, date | CN201710316602 | 08.05.2017 Original published format: CN201710316602 | [2019/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018205325 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3554010 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3554010 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L29/06 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
H04L41/40 (EP);
H04L41/044 (EP,CN,US);
H04L41/509 (EP,US);
H04L41/06 (CN,US);
H04L41/145 (CN,US);
H04L41/5051 (EP,US);
H04L65/40 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER HERSTELLUNG EINER INHALTSBEREITSTELLUNGSNETZWERK-PLATTFORM AUF HETEROGENEN RESSOURCEN | [2019/42] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USE IN CONSTRUCTING CONTENT DELIVERY NETWORK PLATFORM ON HETEROGENEOUS RESOURCES | [2019/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS POUR LA CONSTRUCTION D'UNE PLATEFORME DE RÉSEAU DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU SUR DES RESSOURCES HÉTÉROGÈNES | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2019 | Translation filed | 12.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 27.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2017 | AL | 21.07.2021 | AT | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | DK | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | ES | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | IT | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | MK | 21.07.2021 | NL | 21.07.2021 | PL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SE | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | GR | 22.10.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 01.06.2017 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 01.06.2017 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN101388785 (CHINA TELECOM CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-15 * page 5, line 14 - page 11, line 23 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO2013101217 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] ** figure 2 *; | [XI] - CHUANYANG MIAO ZTE CORPORATION P R CHINA, "H.VCDN.1-NV "Virtual content delivery network Network virtualization" (New): Updated draft (Geneva, 16 - 27 January 2017);TD60 (WP 1/16)", vol. 21/16, (20170126), pages 1 - 17, ITU-T DRAFT; STUDY PERIOD 2017-2020; STUDY GROUP 16; SERIES TD60 (WP 1/16), INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, URL: https://www.itu.int/ifa/t/2017/sg16/docs/170116/td/ties/wp1/T17-SG16-170116-TD-WP1-0060!!MSW-E.docx, (20170126), XP044215551 [X] 1,7 * chapters 6-8 * * figures 6-1,7-2,8-1,8-2 * [I] 2-6,8-15 | [A] - COSTA-PEREZ XAVIER ET AL, "5G-Crosshaul: An SDN/NFV Integrated Fronthaul/Backhaul Transport Network Architecture", TECHNICAL REPORT OF WIRELESS NETWORKING GROUP, COORDINATED SCIENCE LABORATORY; DEPT. ELECTRICAL AND COMPUTER ENGINEERING; UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS AT URBANA-CHAMPAIGN, US, vol. 24, no. 1, doi:10.1109/MWC.2017.1600181WC, ISSN 1536-1284, (20170228), pages 38 - 45, (20170224), XP011641906 [A] 1-15 * chapter 5G-crosshAul Architecture, pages 39-40 * * chapter 5G-crosshaul Architecture Main Components, pages 41-42 * * figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWC.2017.1600181WC | International search | [X]CN101388785 (CHINA TELECOM CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-14; | [A]CN101764810 (CHINESE ACAD INST ACOUSTICS) [A] 1-14; | [A]WO2012034397 (ZTE CORP [CN], et al)[A] 1-14; | [A]CN102624684 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-14 |