EP3626072 - RETRACTABLE LEASH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soyuzov, Artem Anatolievich Ul. Goncharova 15 Kv. 1 Moscow 127254 / RU | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Lapienis, Juozas MSP Europe UAB 21-92 Seimyniskiu Str. 09236 Vilnius / LT | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 17909775.3 | 15.05.2017 | [2020/13] | WO2017RU00310 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018212672 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | RU | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626072 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3626072 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 22.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01K27/00 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
A01K27/004 (EP,EA,IL,US);
A01K27/00 (EA,IL);
A01K27/003 (IL,KR);
A01K15/02 (IL,KR);
B65H75/406 (EA,IL,US);
B65H75/4431 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINZIEHBARE LEINE | [2020/13] | English: | RETRACTABLE LEASH | [2020/13] | French: | LAISSE RÉTRACTABLE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2019 | Translation filed | 27.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 06.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011120389 (YACKLEY BOB [US]) | International search | [DA]US6904872 (MUELLER ROLAND [DE]); | [A]US6925967 (WOODRUFF MICHELE L [US]); | [A]US2009183691 (HASSAN ANDRE [US]) | by applicant | US6904872 |