EP3626227 - COSMETIC COMPOSITION WITH AN OIL TEXTURE, USE AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING AND/OR TREATING SIGNS OF EXTRINSIC AGING AND CUTANEOUS STRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares nº 1188 Bloco A - Vila Jaguará Brasil 05106-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAROLLO MONCAYO, Priscila c/o Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares n° 1188 Bloco A Vila Jaguarà CEP-05106-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | 02 /
RODRIGUES DE PAULA, Leonardo c/o Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares n° 1188 Bloco A Vila Jaguarà CEP-05106-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | 03 /
ARANDAS MONTEIRO E SILVA, Silas c/o Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares n° 1188 Bloco A Vila Jaguarà CEP-05106-000 Soã Paulo - SP / BR | 04 /
CARVALHÃES LAGO, Juliana c/o Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares n° 1188 Bloco A Vila Jaguarà CEP-05106-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | 05 /
DE OLIVEIRA REIS, Eduardo Alexandre c/o Natura Cosméticos S.A. Avenida Alexandre Colares n° 1188 Bloco A Vila Jaguarà CEP-05106-000 São Paulo - SP / BR | 06 /
BAIONE DE MOURA, Soraya Rua Hilda Del Nero Biscolo 350 Condomínio Naturalle Ala Poesia Apartamento 162 CEP-13208-703 Jundiaí - SP / BR | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 17909830.6 | 17.05.2017 | [2020/13] | WO2017BR50117 | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018209411 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | PT | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626227 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 22.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/67, A61K8/58, A61K8/9783, A61K8/92, A61Q19/08, A61K8/34, A61K8/35, A61K8/9789 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
A61K8/347 (EP,US);
A61K8/35 (EP,US);
A61K8/67 (US);
A61K8/678 (EP);
A61K8/92 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K2800/59 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/13] | A61K8/67, A61K8/58, A61K8/9783, A61K8/92, A61Q19/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ÖLTEXTUR, VERWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG UND/ODER BEHANDLUNG DER ANZEICHEN VON EXTRINSISCHER ALTERUNG UND HAUTSTRESS | [2020/13] | English: | COSMETIC COMPOSITION WITH AN OIL TEXTURE, USE AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING AND/OR TREATING SIGNS OF EXTRINSIC AGING AND CUTANEOUS STRESS | [2020/13] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE À TEXTURE HUILEUSE, UTILISATION ET MÉTHODE DE PRÉVENTION ET/OU DE TRAITEMENT DES MANIFESTATIONS DU VIEILLISSEMENT EXTRINSÈQUE ET DU STRESS CUTANÉ | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2019 | Translation filed | 17.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 26.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 26.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 26.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.11.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 17.12.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3097905 (SYMRISE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] * * example 7; table 9 *; | [Y] - anonymous, "Illuminating Concealer", GNPD, MINTEL, (20110114), Database accession no. 1472832, XP055758026 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1 - page 2 * | [Y] - anonymous, "Nordic White Body Oil", GNPD, MINTEL, (20161025), Database accession no. 4337143, XP055758867 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1 * * page 4 * | [Y] - anonymous, "Moisturizer Broad Spectrum SPF 20", GNPD, MINTEL, (20140722), Database accession no. 2518303, XP055758655 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1 * * page 9 * | [A] - RIBONNET L ET AL, "Modulation of CYP1A1 activity by aextract in the human intestinal Caco-2 cells", TOXICOLOGY LETTERS, ELSEVIER BIOMEDICAL PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 202, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.TOXLET.2011.02.006, ISSN 0378-4274, (20110207), pages 193 - 202, (20110215), XP028191502 [A] 1-5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxlet.2011.02.006 | [A] - PATAY ÉVA BRIGITTA ET AL, "Antioxidant potential, tannin and polyphenol contents of seed and pericarp of threeCoffeaspecies", ASIAN PACIFIC JOURNAL OF TROPICAL MEDICINE, HAINAN MEDICAL COLLEGE, SINGAPORE, (20160310), vol. 9, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.APJTM.2016.03.014, ISSN 1995-7645, pages 366 - 371, XP029505995 [A] 1-5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apjtm.2016.03.014 | [A] - Antonio Sergio Souza ET AL, "NATURA LANÇA NOVO TRATAMENTO ANTISINAIS COM ALTA TECNOLOGIA EXTRAÍDA DA BIODIVERSIDADE BRASILEIRA", Revista Cafeicultura . www.revistacafeicultura.com.br, (20071031), URL: https://revistacafeicultura.com.br/materia_impressao.php?mat=13561, (20201209), XP055758184 [A] 1-5 * page 3, paragraph last - page 4, paragraph 1 * | International search | [X]WO2007128723 (SYMRISE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * Pagina 1, linhas 1-2; pagina 3, linhas 19-33; pagina 5, linhas 4-5; pagina 11, linhas 1-7, 18-32; pagina 12, linhas 1-12; pagina 28, linhas 20-31; pagina 29, linhas 1-33; pagina 30, linhas 19-29;. pagina 41, linhas 17-28; pagina 42, linhas 1-34; pagina 43, linhas 1-2; reivindicações 1, 2, 6, 10 e 11. *; | [A]US2011038970 (FERNANDES DE OLIVEIRA AMANDA [BR], et al); | [A]US2011081429 (AOKI AKIHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2011091946 (TEIXEIRA TAGE BIAGGIO ROSA MARIA [BR], et al); | [Y]WO2011050433 (NATURA COSMETICOS SA [BR], et al) [Y] 1, 3-5 * Pagina 1, linhas 5-8; pagina 1, linhas 10-18; pagina 3, linhas 13-32; pagina 4, linhas 1-3; pagina 7, linhas 6-32; pagina 8, linhas 1-5; Exemplos 1-4; reivindicações 2 e 6 *; | [Y]WO2013029127 (NATURA COSMETICOS SA [BR], et al) [Y] 1-5 * Pagina 3, linhas 20-22; pagina 8, linhas 8-20; pagina 11, linhas 13-23; pagina 12, linhas 4-9, 19-32; reivindicações 2, 8 e 9. *; | [A]WO2014090526 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]); | [X]US2015182428 (SCHMIT CATHERINE [US]) [X] 1-5 * [0001]; [0013]; [0013]-[0016]; Tabela 1. *; | [Y]EP3069710 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-5 * [0001]; [0012]; [0016]-[0024]; [0051]; reivindicações 1, 2, 3 e 4 *; | [A]CN106389290 (BERONI BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) |