EP3631208 - FOLDABLE HANDHELD PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Active Tools International (HK) Ltd. 25/F, COFCO Tower 262 Gloucester Road Causeway Bay Hong Kong / HK | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Active Tools International (HK) Ltd. 25/F, COFCO Tower 262 Gloucester Road Causeway Bay Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAM, Koon Fung 25/F COFCO Tower 262 Gloucester Road Causeway Bay Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
CHING, Wai Kwong 25/F COFCO Tower 262 Gloucester Road Causeway Bay Hong Kong / CN | 03 /
XING, Liuxi 25/F COFCO Tower 262 Gloucester Road Causeway Bay Hong Kong / CN | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Sascha, et al Becker & Müller Patentanwälte Turmstraße 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 17910844.4 | 26.05.2017 | [2020/15] | WO2017CN86170 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018214161 | Date: | 29.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3631208 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F04B35/06, F04B39/14, F04B35/04, F04B35/01, F04B39/12 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
F04B35/01 (EP,KR,US);
F04B35/06 (EP,KR,US);
F04C3/04 (US);
B25B1/22 (US);
B25B11/007 (US);
B25B3/00 (US);
F04B35/04 (EP,US);
F04B39/121 (EP,KR);
F04B39/14 (EP,KR,US);
F04B9/04 (KR);
F04C29/124 (US);
B60C23/10 (US);
F04C2210/1005 (US);
F04C2250/00 (US);
F04C29/0014 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | F04B35/06, F04B39/14, F04B9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | FALTBARE HANDPUMPE | [2020/15] | English: | FOLDABLE HANDHELD PUMP | [2020/15] | French: | POMPE PORTATIVE PLIABLE | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 13.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/10] | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4286675 (TUGGLE LLOYD H) [X] 1,4-7 * figures 3,4,13 * * column 5, line 55 - column 11, line 22 * [I] 2,3,8-16; | [Y]US4874296 (MOYNIHAN PATRICK B [US]) [Y] 1-16 * figures 1-13 * * column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 58 *; | [Y]US3724561 (MERRELS F) [Y] 1-16 * figures 1-4 * * column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 39 *; | [A]GB339101 (LESLIE HARTRIDGE) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-3 * * page 2, line 80 - page 3, line 41 *; | [A]US2004159172 (BARKDOLL PATRICK J [US]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]DE102012203471 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-16 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * | International search | [X]US2016245275 (RAWLINGS DAVID LIONEL [US]) [X] 1, 4-6 * description, paragraphs 27-45 and figures 1,3-4 *; | [X]CN203272042U (SHENZHEN BROTHERS AUTOMATION SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1, 4-6 * description, paragraphs 20-26 and figures 1 and 2 *; | [X]US2016305412 (RAWLINGS DAVID [US]) [X] 1, 4-6 * description, paragraphs 61-121 and figures 1-10b *; | [X]CN86104087 (M & T CHEMICALS INC.) [X] 1, 4-6 * description, page 8, line 13-page 14, line 2 and figures 1,3-4 *; | [X]CN106640612 (SHENZHEN FOREACH TECH CO LTD) [X] 1, 4-6 * description, paragraphs 22-36 and figures 1 and 2 *; | [A]CN2851637Y (YANG QI [CN]) [A] 1-16 * description, page 2 line 20-page 3 line 20 and figures 1-4 * |