EP3633838 - BUCK-BOOST CHIP CONTROL METHOD, BUCK-BOOST CHIP, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Li Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 17916235.9 | 18.08.2017 | [2020/15] | WO2017CN98136 | Priority number, date | CN201710502572 | 27.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710502572 | [2020/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019000611 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3633838 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H02M3/158 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
H02M3/158 (EP);
H02M3/1582 (EP,US);
H02M3/335 (EP);
H02M1/0025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | H02M3/335 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | AUFWÄRTS-ABWÄRTS-CHIPSTEUERVERFAHREN, AUFWÄRTS-ABWÄRTS-CHIP UND ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | [2020/15] | English: | BUCK-BOOST CHIP CONTROL METHOD, BUCK-BOOST CHIP, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2020/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PUCE BUCK-BOOST, PUCE BUCK-BOOST, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2020 | Translation filed | 03.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 24.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4801859 (DISHNER BRYAN W [US]); | [XI]EP1990902 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [I]EP2001112 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US2016026205 (SONG MIN SUP [KR], et al); | [A]WO2017047698 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]CN101079650 (RICOH KK [JP]); | [A]CN101478237 (SUZHOU HUAXIN MICRO ELECTRONIC [CN]); | [A]CN101499717 (UNIV ZHEJIANG [CN]); | [A]CN101552554 (UNIV NANJING AERONAUTICS [CN]) |