EP3659526 - MECHANICAL SUTURING DEVICE FOR AUTOMATED CLOSURE OF THE LINEA ALBA OF THE ABDOMINAL WALL POST MIDLINE LAPAROTOMY INCISION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hospital Das Clinicas Da Faculdade De Medicina Da Universidade De São Paulo-HCFMUSP Rua Dr. Ovidio Pires de Campos 225 Prédio da Administração - 5° Andar Cerqueira César 05403-010 São Paulo / BR | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABDALLA, Ricardo Rua Barata Ribeiro 237 Apto 111 01308-000 São Paulo / BR | 02 /
OZAWA, Helio Rua Ouvidor Peleja 164 04128-000 São Paulo / BR | 03 /
MARINANGELO, Alexandra Zapparoli Castro Melo CEP 05017-020, São Paulo - SP / BR | [2024/25] |
Former [2020/23] | 01 /
ABDALLA, Ricardo Rua Barata Ribeiro 237 Apto 111 01308-000 São Paulo / BR | ||
02 /
OZAWA, Helio Rua Ouvidor Peleja 164 04128-000 São Paulo / BR | Representative(s) | Carvalho Franco, Isabel J.E. Dias Costa Lda. Rua do Salitre 195 1269-063 Lisboa / PT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/23] | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17919183.8 | 11.08.2017 | [2020/23] | WO2017BR50228 | Priority number, date | BR20171016192 | 28.07.2017 Original published format: BR102017016192 | [2020/23] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019018907 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | PT | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3659526 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 31.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
A61B17/0469 (EP);
A61B17/04 (BR);
A61B17/0487 (US);
A61B17/0482 (EP,US);
A61B17/0483 (US);
A61B17/068 (BR);
A61B17/32 (US);
A61B2017/00314 (EP);
A61B2017/00327 (EP);
A61B2017/0488 (BR,US);
A61B2017/081 (EP);
A61B2017/320044 (EP,US);
A61B90/361 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Title | German: | MECHANISCHE NÄHVORRICHTUNG FÜR AUTOMATISIERTEN VERSCHLUSS DER LINEA ALBA EINER LAPAROTOMIE HINTER DER BAUCHWAND-MITTELLINIE | [2020/23] | English: | MECHANICAL SUTURING DEVICE FOR AUTOMATED CLOSURE OF THE LINEA ALBA OF THE ABDOMINAL WALL POST MIDLINE LAPAROTOMY INCISION | [2020/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUTURE MÉCANIQUE POUR FERMETURE AUTOMATISÉE DE LA LINEA ALBA DE LA PAROI ABDOMINALE APRÈS INCISION PAR LAPAROTOMIE MÉDIANE | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2020 | Translation filed | 28.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 16.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6613058 (GOLDIN MARK A [US]) [A] 1-3 * figures 19-28 ** column 12, line 41 - column 15, line 39 *; | [A]US7500993 (DE LA TORRE ROGER A [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-11 * * paragraphs [0029] - [0037] *; | [A]WO2010126197 (YOON SANG JIN [KR]) [A] 1-3 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0059] - [0062] *; | [A]US2014276988 (TAGGE BRYAN C [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1A-9B * * paragraphs [0077] - [0096] *; | [A]US2016242763 (KIA MICHAEL AMIRFARZAD [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 22A-41K * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 95] - [0115] *; | [A]WO2016160148 (PREVENT PATCH LLC [US]) [A] 1-3 * figures 4-6 * * paragraphs [0019] - [0026] * | International search | [A]US2009234379 (REHNKE ROBERT D [US]) [A] 1 and 2 * Figures 1 to 11; paragraphs 0049 to 0062 *; | [A]BRPI0615841 (RHAPHIS MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1 and 2 * Figures 1 to 9; line 4, page 16 to line 1, page 25 *; | [A]WO2013032329 (MED IP B V [NL], et al) [A] 1 and 2 * Figures 1 to 9; line 22, page 12 to line 33, page 18 *; | [A]WO2013070841 (EASYLAP LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1 and 2* Figures 1 to 8; pages 1 to 4 *; | [A]US2013282027 (WOODARD JR JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1 and 2 * Figures 1 to 8 and 15; paragraphs 0088 to 0130 and 0148 * | by applicant | BRMU8700808U | US2009234379 | US2009234461 | BRPI0806172 | BRPI0615841 | - LEBLANC KABOOTH WV, "Laparoscopic repair of incisional abdominal hernias using expanded polytetrafluoroethylene: preliminary findings", Surg Laparosc Endosc, (19930000), vol. 3, pages 39 - 41 | - MOREAU PEHELMY NVONS C, "Laparoscopic treatment of incisional hernia. Prior art in 2012", J Visc Surg, (20120000), vol. 149, no. 5, pages e40 - e48 | - CUCCURULLO DPICCOLI MAGRESTA FMAGNONE SCORCIONE FSTANCANELLI VMELOTTI G, "Laparoscopic ventral incisional hernia repair: evidence-based guidelines of the first Italian Consensus Conference", Hernia, (20130000), vol. 17, pages 557 - 566 | - MUDGE MHUGHES LE, "Incisional hernia: a 10 year prospective study of incidence and attitudes", Br J Surg, (19850000), vol. 72, pages 70 - 71 | - NHOA RLHMEGEA DOUAISSIA MSIELEZNEFFA ISASTREA B, "Incidence and prevention of ventral incisional hernia", J Visc Surg, (20120000), vol. l49, pages e3 - e14 | - BITTNER RBINGENER-CASEY JDIETZ UFABIAN MFERZLI GSFORTELNY RHKOCKERLING FKUKLETA JLEBLANC KLOMANTO D, "Guidelines for laparoscopic treatment of ventral and incisional abdominal wall hernias (International Endohernia Society (IEHS)-part 1", Surg Endosc, (20140000), vol. 28, pages 2 - 29 | - HENIFORD BTPARK ARAMSHAW BJVOELLER G, "Laparoscopic ventral and incisional hernia repair in 407 patients", J Am Coll Surg, (20000000), vol. 190, pages 645 - 650 | - HUSSAIN DSARFRAZ SLKASMANI JABALIGA KSIBRAHIM MSYED HSAZIZ ZAHARTUNG RU, "Laparoscopic repair of ventral hernia", J Coll Physicians Surg Pak, (20120000), vol. 22, no. 11, pages 683 - 685 | - FORTE AZULLINO AMANFREDELLI SMONTALTO GCOVOTTA FPASTORE PBEZZI M, "Rives technique is the gold standard for incisional hernioplasty. An institutional experience", Ann Ital Chir, (20110000), vol. 82, no. 4, pages 313 - 317 | - IQBAL WPHAM THJOSEPH ATHOMPSON JMGBSARR MG, "Long-term outcome of 254 complex incisional hernia repairs using the modified Rives-Stoppa technique", World J Surg, (20070000), vol. 31, doi:10.1007/s00268-007-9260-7, pages 2398 - 2404, XP019561276 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00268-007-9260-7 | - NOTASH AYNOTASH AY JRFARSHI JSAMOLI HASALIMI JMAMARABADI M, "Outcomes of the Rives-Stoppa technique in incisional hernia repair: ten years of experience", Hernia, (20070000), vol. 11, pages 25 - 29, XP019475204 | - BAUER JHARRIS MGORFINE SKREEL I, "Rives-Stoppa procedure for repair of large incisional hernias: experience with 57 patients", Hernia, (20020000), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 120 - 123 | - WORMER BAWALTERS ALBRADLEY JFWILLIAMS KBTSIRLINE VBAUGENSTEIN VAHENIFORD BT, "Does ventral hernia defect length, width, or area predict postoperative quality of life? Answers from a prospective, international study", J Surg Res, (20130000), vol. 184, pages 169 - 177 | - BURGER JWLANGE JFHALM JAKLEINRENSINK GJJEEKEL H, "Incisional hernia: early complication of abdominal surgery", World J Surg, (20050000), vol. 29, pages 1608 - 1613, XP019364878 | - VAN RAMSHORST GHEKER HHHOP WCJJEEKEL JLANGE JF, "Impact of incisional hernia on health-related quality of life and body image: a prospective cohort study", Am J Surg, (20120000), vol. 204, doi:10.1016/j.amjsurg.2012.01.012, pages 144 - 150, XP028427552 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjsurg.2012.01.012 | - TSE GHSTUTCHFIELD BMDUCKWORTH ADDE BEAUX ACTULLOH B, "Pseudo-recurrence following laparoscopic ventral and incisional hernia repair", Hernia, (20100000), vol. 14, doi:10.1007/s10029-010-0709-5, pages 583 - 587, XP019862705 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10029-010-0709-5 | - SASSE KCLIM DCLBRANDT J, "Long-term durability and comfort of laparoscopic ventral hernia repair", JSLS, (20120000), vol. 16, pages 380 - 386 | - PERRONE JMSOPER NJEAGON JCKLINGENSMITH MEAFT RLFRISELLA MMBRUNT LM, "Perioperative outcomes and complications of laparoscopic ventral hernia repair", Surgery, (20050000), vol. 138, doi:10.1016/j.surg.2005.06.054, pages 708 - 716, XP005128507 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surg.2005.06.054 | - WILLIAMS RFMARTIN DFMULROONEY MTVOELLER GR, "Intraperitoneal modification of the Rives-Stoppa repair for large incisional hernias", Hernia, (20080000), vol. 12, pages 141 - 145, XP019593438 | - STIPA FGIACCAGLIA VBURZA ASANTINI EBASCONE BPICCHIO M, "Incisional hernia: laparoscopic or open repair?", Surg Laparosc Endosc Percutan Tech, (20130000), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 419 - 422 | - JI YZHAN XWANG YZHU J, "Combined laparoscopic and open technique for the repair of large complicated incisional hernias", Surg Endosc, (20130000), vol. 27, doi:10.1007/s00464-012-2680-y, pages 1778 - 1783, XP035325843 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00464-012-2680-y | - SALVILLA SATHUSU SPANESAR SS, "Analysing the benefits of laparoscopic hernia repair compared to open repair: a meta-analysis of observational studies", J Minim Access Surg, (20120000), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 111 - 117 | - COLAVITA PDTSIRLINE VBBELYANSKY IWALTERS ALLINCOURT AESING RFHENIFORD BT, "Prospective, long-term comparison of quality of life in laparoscopic versus open ventral hernia repair", Ann Surg, (20120000), vol. 256, no. 5, pages 714 - 722 | - MUYSOMS FEMISEREZ MBERREVOET FCAMPANELLI GCHAMPAULT GGCHELALA EDIETZ UAEKER HHEL NAKADI IHAUTER P, "Classification of primary and incisional abdominal wall hernias", Hernia, (20090000), vol. 13, doi:10.1007/s10029-009-0518-x, pages 407 - 414, XP019724340 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10029-009-0518-x | - SCHROEDER ADDEBUS ESSCHROEDER MREINPOLD WM, "Laparoscopic transperitoneal sublay mesh repair: a new technique for the cure of ventral and incisional hernias", Surg Endosc, (20120000), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 648 - 654 | - PRASAD PTANTIA 0PATLE NMKHANNA SSEN B, "Laparoscopic transabdominal preperitoneal repair of ventral hernia: a step towards physiological repair", Indian J Surg, (20110000), vol. 73, no. 6, pages 403 - 408 | - HASBAHCEC MBASAK F, "Interposition of the hernia sac as a protective layer in repair of giant incisional hernia with polypropylene mesh", Surg Today, (20130000), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 227 - 232 | - ABDALLA RZGARCIA RBDA COSTA RIDABDALLA BMZ, "Treatment of mid-line abdominal wall hernias with the use of endo-stapler for mid-line closure ABCD", Arq Bras Cir Dig, (20130000), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 335 - 337 |