EP3661147 - CONTROL METHOD, CONTROL APPARATUS AND CONTROL SYSTEM FOR INTELLIGENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cloudminds (Shenzhen) Robotics Systems Co., Ltd. (Settled in Shenzhen Qianhai Business Secretary Co., Ltd.) Room 201, Block A, No.1 Qianwan Road 1 Qianhaishenport Cooperative District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Huatao Room 201 Block A No. 1 Qianwan Road 1 QianhaishenPort Cooperative District (Settled in Shenzhen Qianhai Bussiness Secretary Co. Ltd.) Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 17919246.3 | 25.07.2017 | [2020/23] | WO2017CN94311 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019019018 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3661147 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
H04L12/4641 (EP,US);
H04L63/0272 (EP,CN);
H04L12/18 (US);
H04L12/2814 (EP,CN);
H04L12/2836 (EP,CN);
H04L41/0806 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVERFAHREN, STEUERVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERSYSTEM FÜR INTELLIGENTE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/23] | English: | CONTROL METHOD, CONTROL APPARATUS AND CONTROL SYSTEM FOR INTELLIGENT DEVICE | [2020/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, APPAREIL DE COMMANDE ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIF INTELLIGENT | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2020 | Translation filed | 20.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 24.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011122774 (HASSAN OMAR [US], et al) [X] 1,5,9,11,12 * abstract * * figures 1,3a,3b * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * [I] 2-4,6-8,10; | [I]US2014359704 (CHEN BEN WEI [US]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1a,1b * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] ** paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * | International search | [A]CN101316275 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-12 * , entire document *; | [A]CN101820344 (CHINA TELECOM CORP LTD) [A] 1-12 * , entire document *; | [A]US2011258453 (MANSFIELD JASON MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-12* , entire document *; | [A]CN102413182 (NANJING TIANSU AUTOMATION CONTROL SYSTEM CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , entire document *; | [A]CN103051642 (SHANGHAI YUNHE INFORMATION SYSTEM CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , claim 1, and figures 1-2 *; | [A]CN104363306 (UNIV XIAMEN) [A] 1-12 * , entire document * |