EP3664590 - TAPE FEEDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Corporation 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUZUKI, Isao c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG. CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Akinobu c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG. CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | 03 /
SHIMIZU, Toshinori c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG. CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 17919982.3 | 04.08.2017 | [2020/24] | WO2017JP28399 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019026279 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3664590 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3664590 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/02, H05K13/04 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
H05K13/0419 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/24] | H05K13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BANDZUFÜHRER | [2020/24] | English: | TAPE FEEDER | [2020/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTRODUCTION DE BANDE | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2020 | Translation filed | 03.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2017 | AL | 29.06.2022 | AT | 29.06.2022 | CY | 29.06.2022 | CZ | 29.06.2022 | DK | 29.06.2022 | EE | 29.06.2022 | ES | 29.06.2022 | FI | 29.06.2022 | HR | 29.06.2022 | IT | 29.06.2022 | LT | 29.06.2022 | LV | 29.06.2022 | MC | 29.06.2022 | MK | 29.06.2022 | PL | 29.06.2022 | RO | 29.06.2022 | RS | 29.06.2022 | SE | 29.06.2022 | SI | 29.06.2022 | SK | 29.06.2022 | SM | 29.06.2022 | IE | 04.08.2022 | LU | 04.08.2022 | FR | 29.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | BG | 29.09.2022 | GB | 29.09.2022 | NO | 29.09.2022 | GR | 30.09.2022 | IS | 29.10.2022 | PT | 31.10.2022 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CY | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
IT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
MK | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
FR | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CY | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
IT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
FR | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
IT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
FR | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
FR | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
FR | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
FR | 29.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
FR | 29.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH104294 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1* figure 5 *; | [XA]JP2013093536 (JUKI KK) [X] 1,2 * See paragraphs [0072]-[0078] and [0144]-[0156];; figures 12-15,41-47 * [A] 3; | [IA]US2017042073 (NAGASAWA YOSUKE [JP], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0061]; figures 4-5 * [A] 3; | [A]WO2017098605 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figures 3-8 * | International search | [A]JPH0294854U [A] 1-3 * , *; | [A]US5050650 (HOLCOMB GREGORY W [US], et al) [A] 1-3* , *; | [XA]JP2013093536 (JUKI KK) [X] 1-2 * , * [A] 3 | by applicant | JP2008205406 |