EP3662598 - EFFICIENT INTERLEAVER DESIGNS FOR POLAR CODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jian 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
XU, Changlong 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
JIANG, Jing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
XU, Hao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
HOU, Jilei 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17919984.9 | 04.08.2017 | [2020/24] | WO2017CN96015 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019024086 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3662598 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H03M13/27 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
H04L1/0057 (EP);
H03M13/2778 (KR,US);
H03M13/13 (EP,KR);
H03M13/15 (US);
H03M13/27 (EP);
H03M13/2721 (EP);
H03M13/2906 (US);
H03M13/616 (US);
H04L1/0041 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/24] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTE VERSCHACHTELUNGSDESIGNS FÜR POLARE CODES | [2020/24] | English: | EFFICIENT INTERLEAVER DESIGNS FOR POLAR CODES | [2020/24] | French: | CONCEPTIONS D'ENTRELACEUR EFFICACES DESTINÉES AUX CODES POLAIRES | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 23.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2015333769 (JEONG HONG-SIL [KR], et al) [X] 8,13,15 * figures 5a-5c,9 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0057] * [A] 1-7,14 [I] 8-13,15; | [E]EP3720024 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0098] ** figures 3-10 *; | [XI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Design and evaluation of Interleaver for Polar codes", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1711222 DESIGN AND EVALUATION OF INTERLEAVER FOR POLAR CODES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170626), XP051300421 [X] 1-8,13-15 * Sections 1 and 2 * [I] 9-12 | [XI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Interleaver design for Polar codes", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1708649 INTERLEAVER DESIGN FOR POLAR CODES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051273836 [X] 1-8,13-15 * Sections 1, 3 and 5 * [I] 9-12 | [XAI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Interleaver design for Polar code", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1709999 INTERLEAVER DESIGN FOR POLAR CODE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170626), XP051299224 [X] 8,13,15 * Sections 1 and 2 * [A] 1-7,14 [I] 8-13,15 | International search | [YX]US2009147724 (NIMBALKER AJIT [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * description, paragraphs [0021]-[0029] description, paragraphs [0021]-[0029] * [X] 8-14; | [A]CN102136888 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102164025 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [Y]US2016173233 (LOGHIN NABIL SVEN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * claim 12, description, paragraphs [0055]-[0066], [0083]-[0084], figure 9 * | by applicant | - "SC-FDE with OQPSK-Type Schemes: An Efficient Transmission Technique for Broadband Wireless Systems", RUI DINIS et al., COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKS, 2009. ICCCN 2009. PROCEEDINGS OF 18TH INTERNATONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20090803), pages 1 - 6 | - "CONTINUOUS PHASE QUADRATURE PHASE SHIFT KEYED (CPQPSK) SIGNALING TECHNIQUE", KUH S et al., 21 ST. CENTURY MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS - WHAT'S POSSIBLE? SAN DIEGO, OCT. 23 - 26, 1988; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. (MILCOM, IEEE, (19881023), vol. 1-3, pages 157 - 161 | - "Proposed Text on pi/2 BPSK and (G) MSK description ; 15-08-0674-00-003c-proposed-text-on-pi-2-bpsk-and-g-mskdescription", IEEE DRAFT, IEEE-SA MENTOR, (20080910), vol. 802.153c, pages 1 - 3 | - "Quadrature Phase Shift Keying modulator & demodulator for Wireless Modem", TAYAB D MEMON et al., COMPUTER, CONTROL AND COMMUNICATION, 2009. IC4 2009. 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20090217), pages 1 - 6 |