EP3584350 - IRON-BASED AMORPHOUS ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Yunlu Advanced Materials Technology Co., Ltd. 7 Xinyuan East Road Lancun Town Jimo Qingdao, Shandong 266232 / CN | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Hongyu 7 Xinyuan East Road Lancun Town Jimo Qingdao Shandong 266232 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Dong 7 Xinyuan East Road Lancun Town Jimo Qingdao Shandong 266232 / CN | 03 /
LI, Qinghua 7 Xinyuan East Road Lancun Town Jimo Qingdao Shandong 266232 / CN | 04 /
PANG, Jing 7 Xinyuan East Road Lancun Town Jimo Qingdao Shandong 266232 / CN | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 17920523.2 | 31.10.2017 | [2019/52] | WO2017CN108475 | Priority number, date | CN201710637409 | 31.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710637409 | [2019/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019024285 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3584350 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22C45/02, H01F1/153, C21D6/00, C21D1/04, H01F27/25, C21D1/74 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
C22C45/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C21D1/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C21D1/26 (EP);
C21D1/74 (EP,CN,KR);
C21D1/76 (US);
C21D6/008 (EP);
C22C38/02 (US);
H01F1/15308 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01F27/25 (CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/52] | C22C45/02, H01F1/153, C21D6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EISENBASIERTE AMORPHE LEGIERUNG | [2019/52] | English: | IRON-BASED AMORPHOUS ALLOY | [2019/52] | French: | ALLIAGE AMORPHE À BASE DE FER | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2019 | Translation filed | 18.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 28.04.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2157258 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009096382 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XA]CN104745972 (INOE AKIHISA, et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 46]; tables 1, 2 * [A] 2,5,7-9; | [A]WO2016204008 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN106636984 (QINGDAO YUNLU ADVANCED MAT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]CN106702291 (QINGDAO YUNLU ADVANCED MAT TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0048]; table 1 * |