EP3657371 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONO, Kazuhiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008310 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Hisashige c/o Mitsubishi Electric Information Network Corporation 6-8, Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 1080023 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Motoka c/o Mitsubishi Electric Information Network Corporation 6-8, Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 1080023 / JP | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 17920534.9 | 06.12.2017 | [2020/22] | WO2017JP43869 | Priority number, date | JP20170150179 | 02.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017150179 | [2020/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019026310 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657371 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/55 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
G06F21/554 (EP,US);
G06F21/568 (US);
G06F2221/034 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM | [2020/22] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM | [2020/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2020 | Translation filed | 24.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 11.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/28] | 05.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US8655823 (KUMAR MANISH [IN]) [I] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US2015256554 (SAKAKIBARA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US2013333040 (DIEHL DAVID F [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] *; | [A]US2015288708 (LIETZ M SHANNON [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2011076161 (NOMURA RES INST LTD) [A] 1-9 * . *; | [A]WO2016147403 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * , * | by applicant | JP2013011949 | JP2016184358 | JP4661512B |